EP3804942 - INTEGRATED MOLDED BODY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Yuki c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI Hideaki c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 03 /
HIRATA Shin c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19814168.1 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019JP21102 | Priority number, date | JP20180109587 | 07.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018109587 | [2021/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019235299 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804942 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29C65/70, B32B5/28, B29C45/00, // B29K69/00, B29K105/02 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B29C45/0005 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C45/0001 (EP);
B29C45/0062 (EP);
B29C45/14008 (KR);
B29C45/14336 (EP,US);
B29C45/14377 (EP);
B29C45/14467 (EP,KR);
B29C65/70 (KR);
B29C70/06 (KR);
B32B5/28 (KR);
B29C2045/1454 (EP);
B29K2055/02 (KR);
B29K2067/003 (KR);
B29K2067/006 (KR);
B29K2069/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/02 (EP);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2995/0012 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | B29C45/14, B29C65/70, B32B5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER FORMKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/15] | English: | INTEGRATED MOLDED BODY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2021/15] | French: | OBJET MOULÉ INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | Translation filed | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 02.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP2062713 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,11-15 * paragraphs [0045] , [0065] , [0098] , [0097] , [0100] , [0106] - paragraph [0108]; figures 4,5,6c,7a; claims 1,2,38,10,26 * [A] 5,7-10 [Y] 13-15 [I] 13-15; | [Y]DE102014205231 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 13-15* paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0002] , [0006]; figure 1 *; | [XPI]WO2018110293 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [XP] 1,4,6-9,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0078] , [0053] , [0054] , [0032] , [0032]; figures 1-18 * [I] 1,4,6-9,11,13-15; | [E]WO2019198015 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [E] 1,2,4-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] - [0046] , [0029] , [0026]; figures 1-6; claims 5,8 *; | [E]JP2020082429 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [E] 1,2,4-6,9-12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0020] - paragraphs [0025] , [0059] * | International search | [A]JPS625775B (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO., LTD.) [A] 1-21 * , claims, drawings *; | [XA]JP2006130862 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 18 * , paragraphs [0025]-[0027], [0048], [0067], example 1, fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [A] 1-17, 19-21; | [PXA]WO2018110293 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PX] 19-21 * , claims, drawings *[PA] 1-18 | by applicant | JPH11179758 | JP2000272014 | JP2002129027 | JP2003236877 | JP2008034823 | JP2016049649 |