26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
09.02.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
07.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.02.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.07.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
30.07.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.07.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
01.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
06.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|