Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11866979 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2022090430 | 24.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019EP83064 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210096187 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019EP83064 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7451528B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2024 | B2 | JP2022509298 | 20.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019EP83064 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113167093B | Global Dossier | 13.01.2023 | B | CN113167093 | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019EP83064 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3870788 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | C0 | EP3870788 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | B1 | EP3870788 | 01.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019EP83064 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020109539 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018220656 | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018220656 | 30.11.2018 |