EP3870788 - WINDOW LIFT SYSTEM AND MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 22.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Bamberg Berliner Ring 1 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAUTMANN, Michael Schaitz 14 95512 Neudrossenfeld / DE | 02 /
HÜMMER, Norman Freiberg 15 96250 Ebensfeld / DE | 03 /
JAHN, Michael Am Ellersgraben 22 96148 Baunach / DE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 19816568.0 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP83064 | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 21.03.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/17] | 03.04.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/18] | 03.04.2024 | Date of registration [2024/18] | 13.03.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/18] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 03.04.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/18] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3870788 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] |