EP3963513 - CONFIGURABLE INPUT BLOCKS AND OUTPUT BLOCKS AND PHYSICAL LAYOUT FOR ANALOG NEURAL MEMORY IN DEEP LEARNING ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Storage Technology, Inc. 450 Holger Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Hieu Van 2642 Gayley Place San Jose, California 95135 / US | 02 /
TRINH, Stephen 3430 Chieri Place San Jose, California 95148 / US | 03 /
VU, Thuan 431 Danna Ct. San Jose, California 95138 / US | 04 /
HONG, Stanley 1848 Bristol Bay Common San Jose, California 95131 / US | 05 /
TIWARI, Vipin 5599 Asterwood Dr. Dublin, California 94568 / US | 06 /
REITEN, Mark 2946 Roundhill Rd. Alamo, California 94507 / US | 07 /
DO, Nhan 20451 Walnut Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 19817533.3 | 18.11.2019 | [2022/10] | WO2019US61902 | Priority number, date | US201962842279P | 02.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962842279 P | US201916449201 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: US201916449201 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222868 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963513 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3963513 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/065, // G06N3/044, G06N3/045, G06N3/048, G11C29/44, G11C29/50 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G11C11/54 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/065 (EP,KR,US);
G06F17/16 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP,KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR);
G06N3/048 (EP,KR);
G11C11/5642 (EP,KR);
G11C16/0483 (US);
G11C16/08 (US);
G11C27/005 (EP,KR);
G11C29/028 (EP,KR);
G11C29/44 (EP,KR);
G11C29/50 (EP,KR);
G11C2029/4402 (EP,KR);
G11C2029/5006 (EP,KR);
G11C2216/04 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | G06N3/063 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARE EINGABE- UND AUSGABEBLÖCKE UND PHYSIKALISCHES LAYOUT FÜR ANALOGE NEURONALE SPEICHER IN EINEM TIEFEN KÜNSTLICHEN NEURONALEN NETZWERK | [2023/49] | English: | CONFIGURABLE INPUT BLOCKS AND OUTPUT BLOCKS AND PHYSICAL LAYOUT FOR ANALOG NEURAL MEMORY IN DEEP LEARNING ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORK | [2022/10] | French: | BLOCS D'ENTRÉE ET BLOCS DE SORTIE CONFIGURABLES ET DISPOSITION PHYSIQUE POUR LA MÉMOIRE NEURALE ANALOGIQUE DANS UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL ARTIFICIEL PROFOND | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/10] | KONFIGURIERBARE EINGABEBLÖCKE UND AUSGABEBLÖCKE UND PHYSIKALISCHES LAYOUT FÜR EINEN ANALOGEN NEURONALEN SPEICHER IN EINEM KÜNSTLICHEN NEURONALEN TIEFENLERNNETZ | ||
Former [2022/10] | BLOCS D'ENTRÉE ET BLOCS DE SORTIE CONFIGURABLES ET CONFIGURATION PHYSIQUE POUR MÉMOIRE NEURONALE ANALOGIQUE DANS UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL ARTIFICIEL À APPRENTISSAGE PROFOND | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2023 | 06.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5298796 (TAWEL RAOUL [US]); | [A]US2019019564 (LI XIA [US], et al); | by applicant | US5029130 | US6747310 | US2017337466 |