EP3898557 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BUTADIENE FROM ETHANOL WITH OPTIMISED IN SITU REGENERATION OF THE CATALYST OF THE SECOND REACTION STEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROBYSHEV, Kirill 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | 02 /
DASTILLUNG, Rejane 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | 03 /
GABELLE, Jean-Christophe 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | 04 /
ROLLAND, Matthieu 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19817723.0 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP85113 | Priority number, date | FR20180073771 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873771 | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020126920 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898557 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3898557 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/207, B01J38/02, B01J38/14, B01J35/00, B01J23/92, B01J23/72, B01J23/20, B01J21/08, C07C47/06, C07C45/00, C07C11/167, B01J38/24 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
C07C1/2072 (EP,US);
B01J19/14 (US);
B01J19/2445 (US);
B01J23/20 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B01J23/92 (EP);
B01J35/19 (EP);
B01J38/02 (EP);
B01J38/04 (US);
B01J38/14 (EP);
B01J8/04 (US);
C07C45/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00164 (US);
B01J38/24 (EP);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2523/72 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP);
Y02P20/584 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/2072, C07C11/167 (EP);
C07C45/002, C07C47/06 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/43] | C07C1/207, C07C11/167, C07C45/00, C07C47/06, B01J21/08, B01J23/20, B01J23/72, B01J23/92, B01J35/00, B01J38/14, B01J38/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BUTADIEN AUS ETHANOL MIT OPTIMIERTER IN-SITU-REGENERATION DES KATALYSATORS DES ZWEITEN REAKTIONSSCHRITTES | [2021/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BUTADIENE FROM ETHANOL WITH OPTIMISED IN SITU REGENERATION OF THE CATALYST OF THE SECOND REACTION STEP | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BUTADIÈNE À PARTIR D'ÉTHANOL AVEC RÉGÉNÉRATION IN SITU OPTIMISÉE DU CATALYSEUR DE LA DEUXIÈME ÉTAPE RÉACTIONNELLE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 21.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2023 | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | IT | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SE | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
IT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2357365 (HORN LEE VAN, et al) [AD] 1-18* figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [AD]FR3026100 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR], et al) [AD] 1-18 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 36; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2017091771 (INAERIS TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0061]; figure 1b; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2357365 | US2915570 | FR1294619 | FR3026100 | FR3026101 | FR3038851 | - W.J. TOUSSAINTJ. LEE MARAH, Synthetic rubber |