EP3887629 - ELECTROMECHANICAL HANDLE LOCKING CAM LATCH WITH KEYED MECHANICAL OVERRIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 15.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southco, Inc. 210 N. Brinton Lake Road P.O. Box 116 Concordville, PA 19331 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARNEAU, Gregory Gilbert 205 Rutgers Boulvard Berlin, NJ 08009 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | 01 /
GARNEAU, Gregory, Gilbert 205 Rutgers Boulvard Berlin, NJ 08009 / US | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Scheele Wetzel Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19817907.9 | 20.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US62402 | Priority number, date | US201862773516P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862773516 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112459 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887629 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05C3/04, E05B9/08, E05B47/06 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
E05C3/042 (EP,US);
E05B9/08 (EP,US);
E05B47/0012 (EP,US);
E05B47/0673 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0059 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER GRIFFVERRIEGELUNGSNOCKENVERSCHLUSS MIT VERSCHLÜSSELTER MECHANISCHER ÜBERSTEUERUNG | [2021/40] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL HANDLE LOCKING CAM LATCH WITH KEYED MECHANICAL OVERRIDE | [2021/40] | French: | VERROU À CAME DE VERROUILLAGE DE POIGNÉE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE AVEC SURPASSEMENT MÉCANIQUE CLAVETÉ | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5931430 (PALMER RALPH P [US]); | [IA]JP3060832U ; | [IA]WO2009109972 (KNOCK N LOCK LTD [IL], et al); | [A]WO2014186475 (ROATIS CALIN [US], et al); | [A]US9536359 (GOKCEBAY ASIL T [US]) | by applicant | US6641236 | US19450626819 |