EP3887052 - PIPETTE TIP TRAY AND RACK ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACEY, William Joseph 16 Ogunquit Road North An dover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | 02 /
SEETO, Paul Kevin 12 Horseshoe Lane Clinton, Massachusetts 01510 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19818317.0 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US60880 | Priority number, date | US201862772269P | 28.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862772269 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112344 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887052 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L9/00 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B01L9/543 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | PIPETTENSPITZENEINSATZ UND GESTELLANORDNUNG | [2021/40] | English: | PIPETTE TIP TRAY AND RACK ASSEMBLY | [2021/40] | French: | PLATEAU DE POINTE DE PIPETTE ET ENSEMBLE PORTOIR | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 03.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0339557 (SCHIEDEL GERT) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 6 - line 28 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 3 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 54 * * figures 1, 2, 3, 8, 9, 10 *; | [XI]EP1110613 (MIKRON PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0022] * * figures 3, 4 * [I] 4,10 |