EP3806868 - EXON SKIPPING OLIGOMERS FOR MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNELL, Frederick, Joseph C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
PASSINI, Marco C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
ESTRELLA, Nelsa C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
HANSON, Gunnar C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
ZHOU, Ming C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
BESTWICK, Richard C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/16] | 01 /
SCHNELL, Frederick, Joseph C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
02 /
PASSINI, Marco C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
03 /
ESTRELLA, Neisa C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
04 /
HANSON, Gunnar C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
05 /
ZHOU, Ming C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
06 /
BESTWICK, Richard C/o Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19818767.6 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019US36764 | Priority number, date | US201862684615P | 13.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862684615 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019241385 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3806868 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, A61K31/7125, A61P21/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP);
C12N2310/11 (EP);
C12N2310/3145 (EP);
C12N2310/3233 (EP);
C12N2310/351 (EP);
C12N2310/3513 (EP);
C12N2320/33 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/16] | A61K31/7088, A61K31/7125, A61P21/00, C12N15/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | EXON-SKIPPING-OLIGOMERE FÜR MUSKELDYSTROPHIE | [2021/16] | English: | EXON SKIPPING OLIGOMERS FOR MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY | [2021/16] | French: | OLIGOMÈRES INDUISANT UN SAUT D'EXON POUR LA DYSTROPHIE MUSCULAIRE | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP22214630.0 / EP4219717 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012289457 (HANSON GUNNAR J [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 26, paragraphs 103,166,119; table 1; sequence 31 * [I] 1,5-15; | [XI]WO2017062835 (SAREPTA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,5-10 * pages 3,32; claims 1,5,9; sequences 2011-2013 * [I] 1,5-15; | [A] - CHARLESTON JAY S. ET AL, "Eteplirsen treatment for Duchenne muscular dystrophy : Exon skipping and dystrophin production", NEUROLOGY, US, vol. 90, no. 24, doi:10.1212/WNL.0000000000005680, ISSN 0028-3878, (20180612), pages e2146 - e2154, URL: https://n.neurology.org/content/neurology/90/24/e2146.full.pdf, XP055877433 [A] 1,5-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1212/WNL.0000000000005680 | [A] - GOEMANS NATHALIE ET AL, "A randomized placebo-controlled phase 3 trial of an antisense oligonucleotide, drisapersen, in Duchenne muscular dystrophy", NEUROMUSCULAR DISORDERS, GB, (20180101), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.nmd.2017.10.004, ISSN 0960-8966, pages 4 - 15, XP055877283 [A] 1,5-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nmd.2017.10.004 | International search | [A]US2017283799 (KAYE EDWARD M [US]); | [A]WO2017213854 (SAREPTA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); |