EP3809757 - CELL MANAGEMENT METHOD, TERMINAL AND NETWORK-SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yumin 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang' an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19819109.0 | 11.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019CN90654 | Priority number, date | CN201810623246 | 15.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810623246 | [2021/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238028 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809757 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3809757 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/36, H04W24/02, H04L41/0806, // H04W36/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04W16/18 (CN,KR);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W36/00838 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/0085 (KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/20 (KR);
H04W36/249 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | H04W36/20, H04W24/02 | ||
Former IPC [2021/16] | H04W36/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/16] | English: | CELL MANAGEMENT METHOD, TERMINAL AND NETWORK-SIDE DEVICE | [2021/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE CELLULE, TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | Translation filed | 08.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010124203 (TENNY NATHAN E [US], et al); | [I]US2013072196 (JUNG INUK [KR], et al); | [X]US2015271717 (MOON JUNG-MIN [KR], et al) | International search | [A]CN1802006 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101179843 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101453770 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101715206 (BEIJING NUFRONTSOFT TECHNOLOGY); | [A]US2010273487 (ALONSO-RUBIO JOSE [SE], et al); | [A]US2012077502 (LIU JING [CN]); | [A]CN103096402 (POTEVIO INST TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |