EP3806956 - METHODS FOR PREVENTING OR DELAYING ONSET OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND OTHER FORMS OF DEMENTIA AND MILD COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZACHRIEL NEUROSCIENCES, LLC 1 Trinity Lane 2nd Floor, Suite B Mount Holly, New Jersey 08060 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states D'Andrea, Michael, R. 14 Anders Drive Cherry Hill NJ 08003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'ANDREA, Michael, R. 14 Anders Drive Cheryy Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/16] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19819383.1 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019US36685 | Priority number, date | US201862684454P | 13.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862684454 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019241329 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3806956 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/00, A61K31/444, A61K31/465, A61K31/55, A61K38/16, A61K38/17, A61K45/06, G01N33/68, A61K31/439 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/465 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K38/164 (EP);
A61K38/1716 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/164, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1716, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/16] | A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG ODER VERZÖGERUNG DES EINSETZENS VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER UND ANDERER FORMEN VON DEMENZ UND LEICHTER KOGNITIVER BEEINTRÄCHTIGUNG | [2021/16] | English: | METHODS FOR PREVENTING OR DELAYING ONSET OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND OTHER FORMS OF DEMENTIA AND MILD COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENT | [2021/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SCHÉMAS POSOLOGIQUES POUR PRÉVENIR OU RETARDER L'APPARITION DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET D'AUTRES FORMES DE DÉMENCE ET DE DÉFICIENCE COGNITIVE LÉGÈRE | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/16] | 16.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 16.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010260671 (YANG JERRY [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0057] , [0177]; figures 3,4; claims 1,2,6,10-21 * [Y] 8-11 [I] 1-10; | [Y]US2017218058 (ROSENTHAL ARNON [US]) [Y] 8-11 * examples 1-32; claims 1,5,14,15 *; | [XDYI] - KEM W R ED - ENNACEUR ABDEL, "THE BRAIN ALPHA7 NICOTINIC RECEPTOR MAY BE AN IMPORTANT THERAPEUTIC TARGET FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE: STUDIES WITH DMXBA (GTS-21)", BEHAVIOURAL BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000101), vol. 113, no. 1/02, doi:10.1016/S0166-4328(00)00211-4, ISSN 0166-4328, pages 169 - 181, XP001064471 [XD] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 8-11 [I] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-4328(00)00211-4 | [Y] - VAN DE HAAR HARM J ET AL, "Blood-Brain Barrier Leakage in Patients with Early Alzheimer Disease", RADIOLOGY, (201611), vol. 281, no. 2, ISSN 0033-8419, pages 527 - 535, XP009536961 [Y] 8-11 * abstract * * conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiol.2016152244 | International search | [A]WO2008140449 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [A] 1, 8-11* entire document *; | [XY]US2012094943 (KEM WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract; para [0078]; [0090]; [0233]-[0242]; [0254]-[0262] * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]US2018153860 (DIDSBURY JOHN R [US]) [X] 11 * claims 1-18; para [0348]-[0350] * [Y] 8-10 | by applicant | US5069904 | US5278176 | US5977144 | US6211194 | WO0220016 | US6416735 | US2003013699 | US2004235850 | US7001900 | US2007060588 | US2008286340 | US8592458 | - ACHARYAA NKLEVINA ECCLIFFORD PM et al., "Diabetes and hypercholesterolemia increase blood-brain barrier permeability and brain amyloid deposition: beneficial effects of the LpPLA2 inhibitor darapladib", J Alzheimers Dis, (20130000), vol. 35, pages 179 - 198 | - AISEN PS, "Review. The potential of anti-inflammatory drugs for the treatment ofAlzheimer's disease", Lancet Neurol, (20020000), vol. 1, page 27984 | - AISEN PSDAVIS KLBERG JDSCHAFER KCAMPBELL KTHOMAS RG et al., "A randomized controlled trial of prednisone in Alzheimer's disease: Alzheimer's disease cooperative study", Neurology, (20000000), vol. 54, page 58893 | - AISEN PSSCHAFER KAGRUNDMAN MPFEIFFER ESANO MDAVIS KL et al., "Effects of rofecoxib or naproxen vs placebo on Alzheimer disease progression", JAMA, (20030000), vol. 289, page 281926 | - ARENDASH GWSENDSTOCK GJSANBERG PRKEM WR, "Improved learning and memory in aged rats with chromic administration of the nicotinic receptor agonist GTS-21", Brain Res, (19950000), vol. 674, pages 252 - 259 | - BANERJEE CNYENGAARD JRWEVERS A et al., "Cellular expression of a7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor protein in the temporal cortex in Alzheimer's and Parkinson's disease: a stereological approach", Neurobiol Dis, (20000000), vol. 7, pages 666 - 672 | - BARTUS RTDEAN RLBEER BLIPPA AS, "The cholinergic hypothesis of geriatric memory dysfunction", Science, (19820000), vol. 217, pages 408 - 417 | - BJORKHEM IMEANEY S, "Brain cholesterol: long secret life behind the barrier", Arterioscler Thromb Vase Biol, (20040000), vol. 24, pages 806 - 815 | - BLANKS JCSCHMIDT SYTORIGOE YPORRELLO KVHINTON DRBLANKS RH, "Retinal pathology in Alzheimer's disease II. Regional neuron loss and glial changes in GLC", Neurobiol Aging, (19960000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 385 - 395 | - BLANKS JCTORIGOE YHINTON DRBLANKS RH, "Retinal pathology in Alzheimer's disease I. Ganglion cell loss in foveal/parafoveal retina", Neurobiol Aging, (19960000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 377 - 384 | - BURGHAUS LSCHUTZ UKREMPEL U et al., "Quantitative assessment of nicotinic acetylcholine receptor proteins in the cerebral cortex of Alzheimer patients", Brain Res Mol Brain Res, (20000000), vol. 76, doi:10.1016/S0169-328X(00)00031-0, pages 385 - 388, XP055081805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-328X(00)00031-0 | - BOWEN DMSMITH CBWHITE PDAVISON AN, "Neurotransmitter-related enzymes and indices of hypoxia in senile dementia and other abiotrophies", Brain, (19760000), vol. 99, no. 3, pages 459 - 496 | - BREESE CRADAMS CLOGEL J et al., "Comparison of the regional expression of nicotinic acetylcholine receptor a7 mRNA and 1 I]-a-bungarotoxin binding in human postmortem brain", J Comp Neurol, (19970000), vol. 387, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1096-9861(19971027)387:3<385::AID-CNE5>3.0.CO;2-X, pages 385 - 398, XP002939574 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9861(19971027)387:3<385::AID-CNE5>3.0.CO;2-X | - CATALDO AMNIXON RA, "Enzymatically active lyosomal proteases are associated with amyloid deposits in Alzheimer brain", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 3861 - 3865 | - CHEN DPATRICK JW, "The a-bungarotoxin-binding nicotinic acetylcholine receptor from rat brain contains only the a7 subunit", J Biol Chem, (19970000), vol. 272, pages 24024 - 24029 | - CLIFFORD PMZARRABI SSIU GKINSLER KJKOSCIUK MCD'ANDREA MRNAGELE RG, "Abeta peptides can enter the brain through a defective blood-brain barrier and bind selectively to neurons", Brain Res, (20070000), vol. 1142, doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2007.01.070, pages 223 - 236, XP005933519 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2007.01.070 | - CLIFFORD PMSIU GKOSCIUK MLEVIN EVENKATARAMAN VD'ANDREA MRNAGELE RG, "a7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor expression by vascular smooth muscle cells facilitates the deposition of Aβ peptides and promotes cerebrovascular amyloid angiopathy", Brain Research, (20080000), vol. 1234, doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2008.07.092, pages 158 - 171, XP025434453 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2008.07.092 | - COGAN DG, "Visual disturbances with focal progressive dementing disease", Am J Ophthalmol, (19850000), vol. 100, pages 68 - 72 | - CONEJERO-GOLDBERGA CDAVIES PULLOAC L, "Alpha7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor: A link between inflammation and neurodegeneration", Neurosci Biobehav Rev, (20080000), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.neubiorev.2007.10.007, pages 693 - 706, XP022513755 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neubiorev.2007.10.007 | - COUTURIER SBERTRAND DMATTER JM et al., "A neuronal nicotinic acetylcholine receptor subunit (a7) is developmentally regulated and forms a homo-oligomeric channel blocked by a-BTX", Neuron, (19900000), vol. 5, doi:10.1016/0896-6273(90)90344-F, pages 847 - 856, XP024247708 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0896-6273(90)90344-F | - CRONIN-GOLOMB ASUGIURA RCORKIN SGROWDON JH, "Incomplete achromatopsia in Alzheimer's disease", Neurobiol Aging, (19930000), vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0197-4580(93)90105-K, pages 471 - 477, XP024366837 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0197-4580(93)90105-K | - CUNHA-VAZ JG, "Studies on the pathology of diabetic retinopathy", Diabetes, (19830000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 20 - 27 | - D'ANDREA MR, "Evidence that the immunoglobulin-positive neurons in Alzheimer's disease are dying by the classical complement pathway", Am J Alzheimers Dis Other Demen, (20050000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 144 - 150, XP009058338 | - D'ANDREA MR, "Evidence linking autoimmunity to neuronal cell death in Alzheimer's disease", Brain Res, (20030000), vol. 982, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0006-8993(03)02881-6, pages 19 - 30, XP009058297 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-8993(03)02881-6 | - D'ANDREA MRCOLE GMARD MD, "The microglial phagocytic role with specific plaque types in the Alzheimer disease brain", Neurobiol Aging, (20040000), vol. 25, page 67583 | - D'ANDREA MRNAGELE RG, "Morphologically distinct types of amyloid plaques point the way to a better understanding of Alzheimer's disease pathogenesis", Biotechnic and Histochemistry, (20100000), vol. 85, no. 2, pages 133 - 47 | - D'ANDREA MRNAGELE RG, "MAP-2 immunolabeling can distinguish diffuse from dense-core amyloid plaques in Alzheimer's disease brains", Biotechic Histochemistry, (20020000), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 95 - 103 | - D'ANDREA MRNAGELE RG, "Targeting the alpha 7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor to reduce amyloid accumulation in Alzheimer's disease pyramidal neurons", Current Pharmaceutical Design, (20060000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 677 - 684 | - D'ANDREA MRNAGELE RGGUMULA NAREISER PAPOLKOVITCH DAHERTZOG BMANDRADE-GORDON P, "Lipofuscin and Abeta42 exhibit distinct distribution patterns in normal and Alzheimer's disease brains", Neuroscience Letters, (20020000), vol. 323, no. 1, pages 45 - 49 | - D'ANDREA MRNAGELE RGWANG HYPETERSON PALEE DHS, "Evidence that neurones accumulating amyloid can undergo lysis to form amyloid plaques in Alzheimer's disease", Histopathology, (20010000), vol. 38, pages 120 - 134 | - D'ANDREA MRREISER PAPOLKOVITCH DA et al., "The use of formic acid to embellish amyloid plaque detection in Alzheimer's disease tissues misguides key observations", Neurosci Lett, (20030000), vol. 342, no. 2, pages 114 - 118 | - D'ANDREA MRREISER PAGUMULA NAHERTZOG BMANDRADE-GORDON P, "Application of triple-label immunohistochemistry to characterize inflammation in Alzheimer's disease brains", Biotech Histochem, (20010000), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 97 - 106, XP009058302 | - DAVIES PMALONEY AJF, "Selective loss of central cholinergic neurons in Alzheimer's disease", Lancet, (19760000), vol. 2, no. 8000, page 1403 | - DE LA TORRE JC, "Vascular basis of Alzheimer's pathology", Ann N Y Acad Sci, (20020000), vol. 977, pages 196 - 215 | - DE LA TORRE JC, "Is Alzheimer's disease a neurodegenerative or a vascular disorder? Data, dogma, and dialectics", Lancet Neurol, (20040000), vol. 3, no. 5, page 270 | - DI PAOLO GKIM TW, "Linking lipids to Alzheimer's disease: cholesterol and beyond", Nat Rev Neurosci, (20110000), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 284 - 96 | - DEUTSCH SIBURKET JAURBANO MRBENSON AD, "The a7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor: A mediator of pathogenesis and therapeutic target in autism spectrum disorders and Down syndrome", Biochemical Pharmacology, (20150000), vol. 97, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.bcp.2015.06.005, pages 363 - 377, XP029294996 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2015.06.005 | - DEWITT DAPERRY GCOHEN MDOLLER CSILVER J, "Astrocytes regulate microglial phagocytosis of senile plaque cores of Alzheimer's disease", Exp. Neurol., (19980000), vol. 149, pages 329 - 340 | - DRACHMAN DALEAVITT J, "Human memory and the cholinergic system", Arch Neurol, (19740000), vol. 30, pages 113 - 121 | - DOWSON JH, "Neuronal lipopigment: a marker for cognitive impairment and long-term effects of psychotrophic drugs", Br J Psychiatry, (19890000), vol. 155, pages 1 - 11 | - DOWSON JHMOUNTJOY CQCAIRNS MRWILTON-COX H, "Changes in intraneuronal lipopigment in Alzheimer's disease", Neurobiol Aging, (19920000), vol. 13, doi:10.1016/0197-4580(92)90077-B, pages 493 - 500, XP024365995 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0197-4580(92)90077-B | - DOWSON JHMOUNTJOY CQCAIRNS MRWILTON-COX H, "Alzheimer's disease: distribution of changes in intraneuronal lipopigment in the frontal cortex", Dementia, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 334 - 342 | - EIKELENBOOM PVAN GOOL WA, "Review. Neuroinflammatory perspectives on the two faces of Alzheimer's disease", J Neural Trans, (20040000), vol. 111, no. 3, page 28194 | - EMMERLING MRWATSON MDRABY CASPIEGEL K, "Review. The role of complement in Alzheimer's disease pathology", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20000000), vol. 1502, page 15871 | - ENNIS SRBETZ AL, "Sucrose permeability of the blood-retinal and blood-brain barriers", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci, (19860000), vol. 27, pages 1095 - 1102 | - ERIKSEN JLSAGI SASMITH TEWEGGEN SDAS PMCLENDON DC et al., "NSAIDs and enantiomers of flurbiprofen target gamma-secretase and lower Abeta42 in vivo", J Clin Invest, (20030000), vol. 112, page 4409 | - FARLOW MRCUMMINGS JL, "Effective pharmacologic management of Alzheimer's Disease", Am J Med, (20070000), vol. 120, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.amjmed.2006.08.036, pages 388 - 97, XP022059357 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjmed.2006.08.036 | - FELDMAN HH et al., "Randomized controlled trial of atorvastatin in mild to moderate Alzheimer disease: LEADe", Neurology, (20100000), vol. 74, no. 12, pages 956 - 64 | - FRANCIS PTPATMER AMSNAPE MWILCOCK GK, "The cholinergic hypothesis of Alzheimer's disease: a review of progress", J Neurol Neurosurg Psychiatry, (19990000), vol. 66, pages 137 - 147 | - GARBUZOVA-DAVIS SHALLER EWILLIAMS SN et al., "Compromised blood-brain barrier competence in remote brain areas in ischemic stroke rats at chronic stage", J Comp Neurol, (20140000), vol. 522, no. 13, pages 3120 - 3137 | - GEIFMAN NBRINTON RDKENNEDY RESCHNEIDER LSBUTTE AJ, "Evidence for benefit of statins to modify cognitive decline and risk in Alzheimer's disease", Alzheimer's Research Therapy, (20170000), vol. 9, page 10 | - GINSBERG SDGALVIN JECHIU TSLEE VMASLIAH ETROJANOWSKI JO, "RNA sequestration to pathological lesions of neurodegenerative diseases", Acta Neuropathol, (19980000), vol. 96, pages 487 - 494 | - GIULIAN DWOODWARD JYOUNG DGKREBS JFLACHMAN LB, "Interleukin-1 injected into mammalian brain stimulates astrogliosis and neovascularization", J. Neurosci., (19880000), vol. 8, pages 2485 - 2490 | - GUAN ZZZHANG XRAVID RNORDBERG A, "Decreased protein levels of nicotinic receptor subunits in the hippocampus and temporal cortex of patients with Alzheimer's disease", J Neurochem, (20000000), vol. 74, pages 237 - 243 | - GUNTERT ADOBELI HBOHRMANN B, "High sensitivity analysis of amyloid beta peptide composition in amyloid deposits from human and PS2APP mouse brain", Neuroscience, (20060000), vol. 143, no. 2, page 46175 | - HAAG MD et al., "Statins are associated with a reduced risk of Alzheimer disease regardless of lipophilicity. The Rotterdam Study", J Neurol Neurosurg Psychiatry, (20090000), vol. 80, no. 1, pages 13 - 7 | - HARTMANN T, "Role of amyloid precursor protein, amyloid-beta and gamma-secretase in cholesterol maintenance", Neurodegener Dis, (20060000), vol. 3, pages 305 - 311 | - HELLSTROM-LINDAHL EMOUSAVI MZHANG XRAVID RNORDBERG A, "Regional distribution of nicotinic receptor subunit mRNAs in human brain: comparison between Alzheimer and normal brain", Mol Brain Res, (19990000), vol. 66, doi:10.1016/S0169-328X(99)00030-3, pages 94 - 103, XP001097531 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-328X(99)00030-3 | - HERZIG MCWINKLER DTBURGERMEISTER P et al., "Abeta is targeted to the vasculature in a mouse model of hereditary cerebral hemorrhage with amyloidosis", Nat Neurosci, (20040000), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 954 - 960 | - IMBIMBO BPSOLFRIZZI VPANZA F, "Are NSAIDs useful to treat Alzheimer's disease or mild cognitive impairment?", Frontiers in Aging Neuroscience, (20100000), vol. 2, no. 19, pages 1 - 14 | - JARVIK GP et al., "Interactions of apolipoprotein E genotype, total cholesterol level, age, and sex in prediction of Alzheimer's disease: a case-control study", Neurology, (19950000), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 1092 - 6 | - JIANG XGUO MSU J et al., "Simvastatin blocks blood-brain barrier disruptions induced by elevated cholesterol both in vivo and in vitro", Int J Alzheimers Dis, (20120000), vol. 2012, page 109325 | - JICK H et al., "Statins and the risk of dementia", Lancet, (20000000), vol. 356, no. 9242, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(00)03155-X, pages 1627 - 31, XP004737858 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)03155-X | - KANEKIYO TXU HBU G, "ApoE and Abeta in Alzheimer's disease: accidental encounters or partners?", Neuron, (20140000), vol. 81, no. 4, pages 740 - 54 | - KATZ BRIMMER S, "Ophthalmologic manifestations of Alzheimer's disease", Surv Ophthalmol, (19890000), vol. 34, doi:10.1016/0039-6257(89)90127-6, pages 31 - 43, XP023266734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-6257(89)90127-6 | - KEM WR, "The brain alpha7 nicotinic receptor may be an important therapeutic target for the treatment of Alzheimer's disease: studies with DMXBA (GTS-21", Behavioral Brain Res, (20000000), vol. 113, doi:10.1016/S0166-4328(00)00211-4, pages 169 - 181, XP001064471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-4328(00)00211-4 | - KIVIPELTO MHELKALA ELLASSKSO MP et al., "Midlife vascular risk factors and Alzheimer's disease in later life: longitudinal, population based study", BMJ, (20010000), vol. 322, no. 7300, pages 1447 - 1451 | - KNOPMAN DSPETERSEN RC, "Mild cognitive impairment and mild dementia: A clinical perspective", May Clin Proc, (20140000), vol. 89, no. 10, pages 1452 - 1459 | - KROGSAA BLUND-ANDERSEN HPARVING HHBJAELDAGER P, "The blood-retinal barrier permeability in essential hypertension", Acta Ophthalmol, (19830000), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 541 - 544 | - KRSTIC DKNUESEL I, "Deciphering the mechanism underlying late-onset Alzheimer disease", Nat Rev Neurol, (20130000), vol. 9, pages 25 - 34 | - KUGLER SBOCKER KHEUSIPP G, "Pertussis toxin transiently affects barrier integrity, organelle organization and transmigration of monocytes in a human brain microvascular endothelial cell barrier model", Cellular Microbiology, (20070000), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1462-5822.2006.00813.x, pages 619 - 632, XP055430637 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1462-5822.2006.00813.x | - LEE DHSD'ANDREA MRPLATA-SALAMAN CRWANG H-Y, "Decreased a7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor proteins in sporadic Alzheimer's disease brains", Alzheimer's Letters, (20000000), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 217 - 220 | - LEE SJADHAV VLEKIC T et al., "Simvastatin treatment in surgically induced brain injury in rats", Acta Neurochir Suppl, (20080000), vol. 102, pages 401 - 404 | - LIM GPYANG FCHU TCHEN PBEECH WTETER B et al., "Ibuprofen suppresses plaquepathology and inflammation in a mouse model for Alzheimer's disease", J Neurosci, (20000000), vol. 20, page 5709, XP003015724 | - "Tissue reactions in the gray matter of the central nervous system", LINDENBERG RHAYMAKER W, Histology and Histopathology of the Nervous System, Charles C. Thomas, (19820000), vol. 1, pages 973 - 1275 | - LI CZHAO RGAO KWEI ZYIN MYLAU LT et al., "Review. Astrocytes: implications for neuroinflammatory pathogenesis of Alzheimer's disease", Curr Alzheimer Res, (20110000), vol. 8, no. 1, page 6780 | - LIU LCHAN C, "Review. The role of inflammasome in Alzheimer's disease", Ageing Red Rev, (20140000), page 615 | - LIU QXIE XEMADI SSIERKS MRWU J, "A novel nicotinic mechanism underlies β-amyloid-induced neurotoxicity", Neuropharmacology, (20150000), vol. 97, pages 457 - 463 | - LUCAS HRRIFKIND JM, "Considering the vascular hypothesis of Alzheimer's disease: effect of copper associated amyloid on red blood cells", Adv Exp Med Biol, (20130000), vol. 765, pages 131 - 138 | - LUND-ANDERSEN H, "Mechanisms for monitoring changes in retinal status following therapeutic intervention in diabetic retinopathy", Surv Ophthalmol, (20020000), vol. 47, no. S2, pages S270 - S277 | - LUSTER AD, "Chemokines-chemotactic cytokines that mediate inflammation", N Engl J Med, (19980000), vol. 338, page 43645 | - MCGEER PLSCHULZER MMCGEER EG, "Review. Arthritis and anti-inflammatory agents as possible protective factors for Alzheimer's disease: a review of 17 epidemiologic studies", Neurology, (19960000), vol. 47, page 42532 | - MCGEER EGMCGEER PL, "Review. The importance of inflammatory mechanisms in Alzheimer disease", Exp Gerontol, (19980000), vol. 33, page 3718 | - MCGEER PLMCGEER EG, "Review. Inflammation of the brain in Alzheimer's disease: implications for therapy", J Leukocyte Biol, (19990000), vol. 65, page 40915 | - MCGEHEE DSHEATH MJGELBER SDEVAY PROLE LW, "Nicotine enhancement of fast excitatory synaptic transmission in CNS by presynaptic receptors", Science, (19950000), vol. 269, pages 1692 - 1696 | - MCGUINNESS B et al., "Statins for the treatment of dementia", Cochrane Database Syst Rev, (20140000), vol. 7, page CD007514 | - MIHALAK KBCARROLL FILEUTJE CW, "Varenicline is a partial agonist at a4p2 and a full agonist at a7 neuronal nicotinic receptor", Mol Pharm, (20060000), vol. 70, no. 3, doi:10.1124/mol.106.025130, pages 801 - 805, XP055140471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.106.025130 | - MOHANDAS ERAJMOHAN VRAGHUNATH B, "Neurobiology of Alzheimer's disease", Indian J Psychiatry, (20090000), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 55 - 61 | - MOORADIAN ADHAAS MJBATEJKO OHOVSEPYAN MFEMAN SS, "Statins ameliorate endothelial barrier permeability changes in the cerebral tissue of streptozotocin-induced diabetic rats", Diabetes, (20050000), vol. 54, no. 10, pages 2977 - 2982 | - MOORE AHO'BANION MK, "Neuroinflammation and anti-inflammatory therapy for Alzheimer's disease", Adv Drug Deliv Rev, (20020000), vol. 54, pages 1627 - 1656 | - MORTEL KFWOOD SPAVOL MAMEYER JSREXER JL, "Analysis of familial and individual risk factors among patients with ischemic vascular dementia and Alzheimer's disease", Angiology, (19930000), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 599 - 605 | - NAGARAJA TNKNIGHT RACROXEN RLKONDA KPFENSTERMACHER JD, "Acute neurovascular unit protection by simvastatin in transient cerebral ischemia", Neurol Res, (20060000), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 826 - 830 | - NAGELE, RGD'ANDREA MRLEE HVENKATARAMAN VWANG HY, "Astrocytes accumulate Abeta42 and give rise to astrocytic amyloid plaques in Alzheimer disease brains", Brain Research, (20030000), vol. 971, pages 197 - 209 | - NAGELE RGD'ANDREA MRANDERSON WJWANG H-Y, "Intraneuronal accumulation of β-amyloid 1-42 is mediated by the a7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor in Alzheimer's disease", Neuroscience, (20020000), vol. 110, no. 2, pages 199 - 211 | - NILSSON LNORDBERG AHARDY JAWESTER PWINBLAD B, "Physostigmine restores [3H]-acetylcholine efflux from Alzheimer brain slices to normal level", J Neural Transm, (19860000), vol. 67, pages 275 - 285 | - NORBERG A, "Human nicotinic receptors-their role in aging and dementia", Neurochem Int, (19940000), vol. 25, pages 93 - 97 | - OLINCY ASTEVENS KE, "Treating schizophrenia symptoms with an alpha7 nicotinic agonist, from mice to men", Biochem Pharm, (20070000), vol. 74, doi:10.1016/j.bcp.2007.07.015, pages 1192 - 1201, XP022259821 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2007.07.015 | - PATERSON DNORBER A, "Neuronal nicotinic receptors in the human brain", Prog Neurobiol, (20000000), vol. 6, pages 75 - 111 | - PERRY EKCOURT JAJOHNSON MPIGGOTT MAPERRY RH, "Autoradiographic distribution of [3H]nicotine binding in human cortex: Relative abundance in subicular complex", J Chem Neuroanat, (19920000), vol. 5, doi:10.1016/0891-0618(92)90056-V, pages 399 - 405, XP025436612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0891-0618(92)90056-V | - PERRY EKGIBSON PHBLESSED GPERRY RHTOMLINSON BE, "Neurotransmitter enzyme abnormalities in senile dementia. Choline acetyltransferase and glutamic acid decarboxlyase activities in necropsy brain tissue", J Neurol Sci, (19770000), vol. 34, doi:10.1016/0022-510X(77)90073-9, pages 247 - 265, XP024298695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-510X(77)90073-9 | - PENG JHLUCERO LFRYER J et al., "Inducible, heterologous expression of human a7-nicotinic acetylcholine receptors in a native nicotinic receptor-null human clonal line", Brain Res, (19990000), vol. 825, pages 172 - 179 | - PETANCESKA SS et al., "Statin therapy for Alzheimer's disease: will it work?", J Mol Neurosci, (20020000), vol. 19, no. 1-2, pages 155 - 61 | - PETANCESKA SS et al., "Changes in apolipoprotein E expression in response to dietary and pharmacological modulation of cholesterol", J Mol Neurosci, (20030000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 395 - 406 | - QUIK MPHILIE JCHOREMIS J, "Modulation of alpha7 nicotinic receptor-mediated calcium influx by nicotinic agonist", Mol Pharmacol, (19970000), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 499 - 506 | - REFOLO LM et al., "A cholesterol-lowering drug reduces beta-amyloid pathology in a transgenic mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", Neurobiol Dis, (20010000), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1006/nbdi.2001.0422, pages 890 - 9, XP001162772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/nbdi.2001.0422 | - ROCKWOOD K et al., "Use of lipid-lowering agents, indication bias, and the risk of dementia in community-dwelling elderly people", Arch Neurol, (20020000), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 223 - 7 | - ROGERS JMORRISON JH, "Quantitative morphology and regional and laminar distributions of senile plaques in Alzheimer's disease", J. Neurosci., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 2801 - 2808, XP055075739 | - ROJO LEFERNANDEZ JAMACCIONI AAJIMENEZ JMMACCIONI RB, "Review. Neuroinflammation: implications for the pathogenesis and molecular diagnosis of Alzheimer's disease", Arch Med Res, (20080000), vol. 39, no. 1, page 116 | - RYLETT RJBALL MJCOLHUON EH, "Evidence for high affinity choline transport in synaptosomes prepared from hippocampus and neocortex of patients with Alzheimer's disease", Brain Res, (19830000), vol. 289, doi:10.1016/0006-8993(83)90017-3, pages 169 - 175, XP024263225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-8993(83)90017-3 | - SANO M et al., "A randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled trial of simvastatin to treat Alzheimer disease", Neurology, (20110000), vol. 77, no. 6, pages 556 - 63 | - SASTRE MKLOCKGETHER THENEKA MT, "Review. Contribution processes to Alzheimer's disease: molecular mechanisms", Int J Neurosci, (20060000), vol. 24, page 16776 | - SCHRODER HWEVERS A, "Nicotinic acetylcholine receptors in Alzheimer's disease", Alzheimer's Dis Rev, (19980000), vol. 3, pages 20 - 27 | - SEGUELA PWADICHE JDINELEY-MILLER K et al., "Molecular cloning, functional properties, and distribution of rat brain alpha 7: a nicotinic cation channel highly permeable to calcium", J Neurosci, (19930000), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 596 - 604 | - SHOHAM SEBSTEIN RP, "The distribution of (3-amyloid precursor protein in rat cortex after systemic kainite-induced seizures", Exp Neurol, (19970000), vol. 147, page 36176 | - SIMONS M et al., "Cholesterol and Alzheimer's disease: is there a link?", Neurology, (20010000), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 1089 - 93 | - SIMONS M et al., "Treatment with simvastatin in normocholesterolemic patients with Alzheimer's disease: a 26-week randomized, placebo-controlled, double-blind trial", Ann Neurol, (20020000), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 346 - 50 | - SKOOG I, "Risk factors for vascular dementia: a review", Dementia, (19940000), vol. 5, pages 137 - 144 | - SPARKS DL et al., "Link between heart disease, cholesterol, and Alzheimer's disease: a review", Microsc Res Tech, (20000000), vol. 50, no. 4, doi:10.1002/1097-0029(20000815)50:4<287::AID-JEMT7>3.0.CO;2-L, pages 287 - 90, XP002462914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0029(20000815)50:4<287::AID-JEMT7>3.0.CO;2-L | - SU GCARENDASH GWKALARIA RNBJUGSTAD KBMULLAN M, "Intravascular infusions of soluble beta-amyloid compromise the blood-brain barrier, activate CNS glial cells and induce peripheral hemorrhage", Brain Res, (19990000), vol. 818, no. 1, pages 105 - 117 | - SZEKELY CAZANDI PP, "Non-steroidal anti-inflammatory drugs and Alzheimer's disease: the epidemiological evidence", CNS Neurol Disord Drug Targets, (20100000), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 132 - 139 | - TATTON WTCHEN DCHARMERS-REDMAN RWHEELER LNIXON RTATTON N, "Hypothesis of a common basis for neuroprotection in glaucoma and Alzheimer's disease: anti-apoptosis by alpha-2-adrenergic receptor activation", Surv Ophthalmol, (20030000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages S25 - S37 | - TUPPO EEARIAS HR, "Review. The role of inflammation in Alzheimer's disease", Int J Biochem Cell Bio, (20050000), vol. 37, page 289305 | - VAN VLIET EADA COSTA ARAUJO SREDEKER SVAN SCHAIK RARONICA EGORTER JA, "Blood-brain barrier leakage may lead to progression of temporal lobe epilepsy", Brain, (20070000), vol. 1302, pages 521 - 534 | - VINORES SAKUCHLE MMAHLOW JCHIU CGREEN WRCAMPOCHIARO PA, "Blood-ocular barrier breakdown in eyes with ocular melanoma", Am J Pathol, (19950000), vol. 147, no. 5, pages 1289 - 1297 | - VINORES SA, "Localization of blood-retinal barrier breakdown in human pathologic specimens by immunohistochemical staining for albumin", Lab Invest, (19900000), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 742 - 750 | - WANG HYLEE DHD'ANDREA MRPETERSON OASHANK RPREITZ AB, "Beta-Amyloid(1-42) binds to alpha7 nicotinic receptor with high affinity. Implications for Alzheimer's disease pathology", J Bio Chem, (20000000), vol. 275, no. 8, pages 5626 - 5628 | - WANG HYLEE DHDAVIS CBSHANK RP, "Amyloid peptide Abeta(1-42) binds selectively and with picomolar affinity to alpha7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptors", J Neurochem, (20000000), vol. 75, no. 3, pages 1155 - 1162 | - WANG HYD'ANDREA MRNAGELE RG, "Cerebellar diffuse amyloid plaques are derived from dendritic Abeta42 accumulations in Purkinje cells", Neurobiology of Aging, (20020000), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0197-4580(01)00279-2, pages 213 - 223, XP085005580 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0197-4580(01)00279-2 | - WEGGEN SERIKSEN JLDAS PSAGI SAWANG RPIETRZIK CU et al., "A subset of NSAIDs lower amyloidogenic Abeta42 independently of cyclooxygenase activity", Nature, (20010000), vol. 414, page 21216 | - WELLINGTON CL, "Cholesterol at the crossroads: Alzheimer's disease and lipid metabolism", Clin Genet, (20040000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 16 | - WEVERS ABURGHAUS LMOSER N et al., "Expression of nicotinic acetylcholine receptors in Alzheimer's disease: postmortem investigations and experimental approaches", Behav Brain Res, (20000000), vol. 113, doi:10.1016/S0166-4328(00)00215-1, pages 207 - 215, XP002714067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-4328(00)00215-1 | - WEYER SWKLEVANSKI MDELEKATE A et al., "APP and APLP2 are essential at PNC and CNS synapses for transmission, spatial learning and LTP", The EMBO Journal, (20110000), vol. 30, pages 2266 - 2280 | - WHITEHOUSE PJKALARIA RN, "Nicotinic receptors and neurodegenerative dementing diseases: basic research and clinical implications", Alzheimer Dis Assoc Disord, (19950000), vol. 9, pages 3 - 5 | - WHITEHOUSE PJPRICE DLSTRUBLE RGCLARKE ACOYLE JDELONG M, "Alzheimer's disease and senile dementia: loss of neurons in basal forebrain", Science, (19820000), vol. 215, doi:10.1126/science.7058341, pages 1237 - 1239, XP000861793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7058341 | - WINSLOW BTONYSKO MKSTOB CMHAZLEWOOD KA, "Treatment of Alzheimer Disease", Am Fam Physician, (20110000), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 1403 - 1412 | - WOLOZIN B et al., "Decreased prevalence of Alzheimer disease associated with 3-hydroxy-3-methyglutaryl coenzyme A reductase inhibitors", Arch Neurol, (20000000), vol. 57, no. 10, pages 1439 - 43 | - WONG TY, "Is retinal photography useful in the measurement of stroke risk?", Lancet, (20040000), vol. 3, doi:10.1016/S1474-4422(04)00682-9, page 179, XP004808836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1474-4422(04)00682-9 | - XIA MQHYMAN BT, "Review. Chemokines/chemokine receptors in the central nervous system and Alzheimer's disease", J Neurovirol, (19990000), vol. 5, page 3241 | - YAO J et al., "Aging, gender and APOE isotype modulate metabolism of Alzheimer's Abeta peptides and F-isoprostanes in the absence of detectable amyloid deposits", J Neurochem, (20040000), vol. 90, no. 4, pages 1011 - 8 | - YANG TXIAO TSUN QWANG K, "The current agonists and positive allosteric modulators of alpha7 nAChR for CNS indications in clinical trials", Acta Pharmaceutica Sinica B, (20170000), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.apsb.2017.09.001, pages 611 - 622, XP055627182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsb.2017.09.001 | - YIN D, "Biochemical basis of lipofuscin, ceroid, and age pigment-like fluorophores", Free Radic Biol Med, (19960000), vol. 21, pages 871 - 888 | - ZHANG ZGZHANG LJIANG Q et al., "VEGF enhances angiogenesis and promotes blood-brain barrier leakage in the ischemic brain", J Clin Invest, (20000000), vol. 106, no. 7, doi:10.1172/JCI9369, pages 829 - 838, XP055225450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI9369 |