EP3809095 - 3D INFORMATION DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikrobot Co., Ltd. Room 304, Unit B, Building 2 399 Danfeng Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2022/51] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikrobot Technology Co., Ltd. Room 304, Unit B, Building 2 399 Danfeng Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hualin Room 304, Unit B, Building 2, 399 Danfeng Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
HE, Pinjiang Room 304, Unit B, Building 2, 399 Danfeng Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Juan Room 304, Unit B, Building 2, 399 Danfeng Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Jing Room 304, Unit B, Building 2, 399 Danfeng Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19819633.9 | 14.03.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019CN78168 | Priority number, date | CN201820937584U | 15.06.2018 Original published format: CN 201820937584 U | [2021/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019237782 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809095 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G01B11/2513 (EP,US);
G01B11/2545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | 3D-INFORMATIONSDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/16] | English: | 3D INFORMATION DETECTION DEVICE | [2021/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'INFORMATIONS TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | Translation filed | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN101825445 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [X] 1,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0026] - [0031] * [Y] 6,7,9,10 [I] 2-5,8,9; | [Y]CN102829736 (UNIV HEBEI TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [XYI]CN203259133U (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0010] - [0021] * [Y] 6,7,9,10 [I] 2-5,8,9; | [Y]US2013321592 (KUNO TOSHIYA [JP]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figures 2a-2c ** paragraphs [0024] - [0028] *; | [XYI] - SUKHAN LEE ET AL, "A real-time 3D IR camera based on hierarchical orthogonal coding", 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA) : ORLANDO, FLORIDA, 15 - 19 MAY 2006, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20060515), doi:10.1109/ROBOT.2006.1642004, ISBN 978-0-7803-9505-3, pages 2035 - 2040, XP010921566 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * Chapter II and III, and the conclusion, in particular III.B Proessing/control Module (PCM) and III.F Processing speed * [Y] 6,7,9,10 [I] 3-5,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2006.1642004 | International search | [X]CN101825445 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [X] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0059], and figures 1-8 *; | [A]CN205448962U (SHENZHEN INST OF ADV TECH CAS) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [X]CN207301612U (SHENZHEN ORBBEC CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0015]-[0023], and figures 1-3 *; | [PX]CN208579746U (HANGZHOU HIKVISION DIGITAL TEC) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |