EP3807320 - COMBINATION THERAPY WITH NEOANTIGEN VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioNTech US Inc. 40 Erie Street, Suite 110 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANG, Robert 34 Larchmont Avenue Waban, Massachusetts 02468 / US | 02 /
GAYNOR, Richard 135 Clarendon Street, Apt. 8W Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | 03 /
GOLDSTEIN, Matthew 30 Billings Lane Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | [2021/26] |
Former [2021/16] | 01 /
ANG, Robert 34 Larchmont Avenue Waban, Massachusetts 02468 / US | ||
02 /
GAYNOR, Richard 135 Clarendon Street, Apt. 8W Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | |||
03 /
GOLDSTEIN, Matthew 780 Centre Street, Unit 2 Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19820230.1 | 11.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019US36632 | Priority number, date | US201862684013P | 12.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862684013 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019241306 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3807320 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61K39/00, A61K35/17 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
A61K2039/507 (EP);
A61K2039/5154 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5158 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (US);
A61K2039/55 (US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP);
A61K2039/55583 (US);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
A61K2039/876 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/0011, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/16] | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT NEOANTIGEN-IMPFSTOFF | [2021/16] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY WITH NEOANTIGEN VACCINE | [2021/16] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE COMPRENANT UN VACCIN À BASE DE NÉOANTIGÈNES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2015095811 (BOARD INST INC [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2012301488 (ZHANG YONGKE [US], et al); | [XY]WO2016023960 (ALLIGATOR BIOSCIENCE AB [SE]); | [Y]US2016069895 (DELAMARRE LELIA [US], et al) |