EP3807448 - ROTARY REACTOR FOR UNIFORM PARTICLE COATING WITH THIN FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEIKIRK, Colin C. 2241 Mora Place Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 02 /
NARWANKAR, Pravin K. 392 Waverly Street Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
GANGAKHEDKAR, Kaushal 3475 Heritage Oaks Drive San Jose, California 95148 / US | 04 /
SIVARAMAKRISHNAN, Visweswaren 7528 Donegal Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
FRANKEL, Jonathan 40 Fairview Plaza Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 06 /
ISHIKAWA, David Masayuki 1009 Clark Avenue Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 07 /
TRUONG, Quoc 4035 Canyon Crest Road W San Ramon, California 94582 / US | 08 /
YUDOVSKY, Joseph 594 Smokey Court Campbell, California 95008 / US | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19820231.9 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019US36721 | Priority number, date | US201862683763P | 12.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862683763 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019241351 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807448 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3807448 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, B01J19/00, C23C16/442, B01J3/00, B01J3/02, B01J3/03, B01J4/00, B01J15/00, B01J19/18, C23C16/44 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
C23C16/4417 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45544 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/501 (KR);
A61K9/5021 (KR);
A61K9/5089 (KR,US);
B01J15/00 (EP);
B01J19/006 (EP);
B01J19/0066 (EP);
B01J19/1887 (EP);
B01J3/006 (EP);
B01J3/02 (EP);
B01J3/03 (EP);
B01J4/007 (EP);
C23C16/40 (KR);
C23C16/4412 (KR);
C23C16/442 (EP,US);
C23C16/4488 (KR);
C23C16/45548 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | C23C16/455, C23C16/44, C23C16/448, A61K9/50, B01J19/00, B01D1/22, B01D3/10, B01J2/00, B01J2/10, C23C16/442, B01J3/00, B01J3/02, B01J3/03, B01J4/00, B01J15/00, B01J19/18, // B01J8/00, B05C19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/46] | C23C16/455, C23C16/44, C23C16/448, A61K9/50, B01J19/00, B01D1/22, B01D3/10, B01J2/00, B01J2/10, C23C16/442, // B01J8/00, B05C19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/19] | C23C16/455, C23C16/44, C23C16/448, C23C16/40, A61K9/50, B01F27/072, B01F27/70, B01F33/40, B01F33/70, C23C16/442, B01J19/00, B01J3/03, B01J3/00, B01J3/02, B01J4/00, B01J15/00, B01J19/18 | ||
Former IPC [2021/16] | C23C16/455, C23C16/44, C23C16/448, C23C16/40, A61K9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTIERENDER REAKTOR ZUR GLEICHMÄSSIGEN TEILCHENBESCHICHTUNG MIT DÜNNEN SCHICHTEN | [2021/16] | English: | ROTARY REACTOR FOR UNIFORM PARTICLE COATING WITH THIN FILMS | [2021/16] | French: | RÉACTEUR ROTATIF POUR LE REVÊTEMENT UNIFORME DE PARTICULES DE FILMS MINCES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011116984 (REHMAT AMIRALI GULAMHUSSEIN [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0032] *; | [Y]US2011200822 (DETAVERNIER CHRISTOPHE [BE], et al) [Y] 13* paragraphs [0028] , [0050] , [0062] *; | [XYI]US2018019468 (ZHU YIMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14-16 * paragraphs [0045] , [0048] , [0049] , [0052] - [0054]; figures ,21 * [Y] 9,13 [I] 17-20 | International search | [A]US3818982 (WAGNER R) [A] 1-35 * See column 3, line 22 -column 4, line 45; and figure 1. *; | [A]WO2007123510 (ZIA METALLURG PROCESSES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-35* See claim 1; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2011116984 (REHMAT AMIRALI GULAMHUSSEIN [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0038]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013059073 (JIANG YING-BING [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0003], [0043]-[0056]; claim 1; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2014127756 (BOLZ EDWIN WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * See paragraphs [0070]-[0071]; and figures 8A-8C. * | by applicant | US2018019468 |