EP3816829 - DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Masanori c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
IGARASHI, Yuminobu c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
YAMANAKA, Yuki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19820281.4 | 07.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019JP22738 | Priority number, date | JP20180113154 | 13.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018113154 | [2021/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019240038 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816829 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3816829 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/55, H04L9/40 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP);
H04L43/04 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP);
G16Y30/10 (US);
G16Y40/10 (US);
H04L63/1408 (EP);
H04L63/1441 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | G06F21/55, H04L12/70, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2021/18] | G06F21/55, H04L12/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN | [2021/18] | English: | DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD | [2021/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | Translation filed | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | IE | 07.06.2023 | LU | 07.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
IE | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
IE | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]KR20030010263 (PENTA SECURITY SYSTEM INC [KR]); | [A]WO2017221711 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | International search | [YA]JP2018025936 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD); | [XYA]JP2018073258 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); |