EP3894395 - CYCLOPENTYL NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGS AS ANTI-VIRALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen BioPharma, Inc. 260 E. Grand Avenue, 2nd Floor South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Minghong 260 E. Grand Avenue South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
WANG, Guangyi 260 E. Grand Avenue South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Snaith, James Michael, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19820876.1 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019IB60431 | Priority number, date | US201862778818P | 12.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862778818 P | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020121123 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3894395 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/47, C07D239/54, C07D473/18, C07D473/34, C07D487/04, C07F9/09, C07F9/24, A61P31/12, A61P31/20, A61K31/513, A61K31/519, A61K31/52, A61K31/6615, A61K31/664, A61K31/685 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
C07D473/18 (EP,KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (US);
A61K31/519 (KR,US);
A61K31/522 (KR,US);
A61K31/685 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P31/12 (EP,KR);
A61P31/18 (KR);
A61P31/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/10 (US);
C07D239/22 (US);
C07D239/47 (EP);
C07D239/54 (EP);
C07D473/34 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | CYCLOPENTYL-NUKLEOSIDANALOGA ALS VIRUZIDE | [2021/42] | English: | CYCLOPENTYL NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGS AS ANTI-VIRALS | [2021/42] | French: | ANALOGUES DE NUCLÉOSIDE CYCLOPENTYLE UTILISÉS COMME ANTIVIRAUX | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 02.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 24.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0481754 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81-97 * abstract * * page 5, lines 46, 50 * * page 24, paragraph l; compound 36 * [Y] 1-49,79-97; | [XY]CN101134769 (ZHAOBIN ZENG [CN]) [X] 1-3,8,9,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81-97 * abstract * [Y] 1-49,79-97; | [X]WO2010074534 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * claim 1; compound (5) *; | [X]CN102384946 (NANJING CHANGAO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,24,26,35,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * page 3, paragraph [0003] *; | [X]EP2594569 (ZHEJIANG AUSUN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * pages 4, 63; compound 25 * * page 12; table . * * pages 57-59; examples 9-12; compounds 7a-e *; | [X]WO2013076236 (ESTEVE QUIMICA SA [ES]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * pages 27-28; table 2 *; | [X]CN103804417 (BEIJING MEIBEITA PHARMACEUTICAL RES CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * page 6; compound V *; | [X]EP2998307 (BEIJING MEIBEITA DRUG RES CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * pages 21-22; example 16 *; | [XY]CN105585569 (CHIA TAI TIANQING PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * abstract * [Y] 1-49,79-97; | [X]KR101640504B (DONGBANG FTL CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,8,9,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * pages 7-8, paragraphs [0039]-[0041] *; | [X]WO2016134057 (ABBVIE INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10-14,24,26,28,36,43,45,46,49,79,81 * abstract * * page 8, paragraphs [0007],[0008]; compounds Formula III, III' * * pages 2-7; table 1; compounds 6-8 *; | [X]WO2016182934 (ABBVIE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,10,13,14,24,26,28,36,43,45,46,49,79,81 * abstract * * pages 11-12, paragraph [0009]; compounds Formula IIIA-IIIG * * pages 2-7; table 1; compounds 6-8 *; | [XY]WO2018092728 (NAT CENTER FOR GLOBAL HEALTH AND MEDICINE [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,15-18,20,21,25,28,36,42,44,46,48,49,79,81-97 * abstract * * example 1; compounds (E)-18-F, (Z)-18-F * * example 2; compounds (E)-18-Cl * * tables 1, 2 * [Y] 1-49,79-97; | [XP]WO2019062924 (GUANGZHOU HENOVCOM BIOSCIENCE CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 1,2,8,9,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81-84,86-89* abstract *; | [P]EP3543238 (NAT CENTER FOR GLOBAL HEALTH AND MEDICINE [JP]); | [X] - PATHIRANA, C. ET AL., "Identification of amino acid derivatives as condensation products between glyceraldehyde and guanine nucleoside", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2012), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.tetlet.2012.10.068, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 132 - 133, XP055667573 [X] 1,2,8,9,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * page 132; figure 1; compounds 2a, 2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2012.10.068 | [X] - AKHMET'YANOVA, V.A. ET AL., "Vicinally substituted cyclopentenes and cyclopentenones from (+/-)-7,7-dichlorobicyclo[3.2.0]hept-2-en-6-one", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 51, no. 3, doi:10.1134/S1070428015030057, ISSN 1070-4280, (2015), pages 319 - 324, (20150416), XP035483095 [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,24,25,35,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * Scheme 3; page 320 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1070428015030057 | [XY] - KUMAMOTO, H. ET AL., "Diastereoselective Synthesis of 6''-( Z )- and 6''-( E )-Fluoro Analogues of Anti-hepatitis B Virus Agent Entecavir and Its Evaluation of the Activity and Toxicity Profile of the Diastereomers", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2016), vol. 81, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acs.joc.6b00105, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2827 - 2836, XP055605358 [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,24,25,28,36,42,44,48,49,79,81-84,86-89 * page 2827; figure 1; compounds (Z)-3, (E)-3 * * page 2831, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1; tables 3, 4 * [Y] 1-49,79-97 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.joc.6b00105 | [X] - ZAMAN, R. ET AL., "Discovery of a Tin-Piperonal-Entecavir Schiff Base Compound That Overcomes Multidrug Resistance by Inhibiting P-Glycoprotein", ASSAY AND DRUG DEVELOPMENT TECHNOLOGIES, (201806), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1089/adt.2018.844, ISSN 1540-658X, pages 205 - 211, XP055667579 [X] 1,2,8,9,24,25,28,36,42,44,46,49,79,81 * page 206; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/adt.2018.844 | by applicant | US5432272 | WO03072757 | US7125855 | US7285658 | WO2008089105 | US7598230 | WO2010030858 | WO2010036407 | WO2010091386 | US7807653 | US8163707 | WO2012094248 | US8440813 | US8609627 | US2014038916 | WO2015056213 | WO2015077360 | US9095599 | US9156874 | US9173893 | WO2016134056 | WO2016134054 | US2016280729 | WO2016182936 | WO2016182935 | WO2017040895 | WO2017040892 | WO2017156262 | WO2017165489 | - SHIEH et al., Nature, (19870000), vol. 329, no. 6137, pages 343 - 346 | - Biochem., (19720000), vol. 11, pages 942 - 944 | - MANDAL, SUKHENDU B.ACHARI, BASUDE, Synthetic Communications, (19930000), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1239 - 44 | - PORCHEDDU et al., European Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20080000), vol. 34, pages 5786 - 5797 | - MILECKI et al., Journal of Labelled Compounds and Radiopharmaceuticals, (20010000), vol. 44, pages 763 - 783 | - J. Med. Chem., (20140000), vol. 57, pages 1531 - 1542 | - LANFORD et al., J Virol., (19950000), vol. 69, no. 7, pages 4431 - 4439 |