EP3877881 - RETURN-ORIENTED PROGRAMMING PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C2A-SEC, Ltd. Derech Agudat Sport Ha'poel 2 P.O. Box 84 9695102 Jerusalem / IL | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDOVICH, Yitzhack 4/1 Elazar Ben Yair St. 9326704 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
FUCHS, Yoav 11/2 Mish'ol Klil Hahoresh St. 9090700 Har Gillo / IL | 03 /
BRAKHA, Nir 3 Namir Street, building 7 Tel Aviv 6492904 / IL | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19820886.0 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019IL51192 | Priority number, date | US201862756595P | 07.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862756595 P | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020095295 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877881 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/52, G06F21/54, G06F21/56 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G06F21/52 (EP);
G06F21/554 (US);
G06F21/54 (EP,US);
G06F21/566 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | RÜCKORIENTIERTER PROGRAMMIERSCHUTZ | [2021/37] | English: | RETURN-ORIENTED PROGRAMMING PROTECTION | [2021/37] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LA PROGRAMMATION ORIENTÉE RETOUR | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 24.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2013109546 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO2016094152 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]); | by applicant | WO2018037397 |