EP3810058 - TRANSFER MATTRESS CONSTRUCTED AT PARTIALLY OF AN AIR PERMEABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D.T. Davis Enterprises, Ltd. (d/b/a Hovertech International) 4482 Innovation Way Allentown, Pennsylvania 18109 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, David, T. 2261 Woodlark Circle Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard @ Friends Patentanwälte Maximilianstrasse 2 Palais an der Oper 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Tal 30 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19821557.6 | 20.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US38161 | Priority number, date | US201862687427P | 20.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862687427 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019246354 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810058 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00, A61G7/10 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61G1/013 (EP);
A61G7/1026 (EP,US);
A61G1/04 (EP);
A61G7/1021 (US);
A61G7/1028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSMATRATZE, DIE TEILWEISE AUS EINEM LUFTDURCHLÄSSIGEN MATERIAL AUFGEBAUT IST | [2021/17] | English: | TRANSFER MATTRESS CONSTRUCTED AT PARTIALLY OF AN AIR PERMEABLE MATERIAL | [2021/17] | French: | MATELAS DE TRANSFERT CONSTRUIT AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT À PARTIR D'UN MATÉRIAU PERMÉABLE À L'AIR | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003070226 (HEIMBROCK RICHARD H [US]) [A] 1-20* , entire document; *; | [A]US2005076437 (JOHNSON RAYNOR A [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document; *; | [XYA]US2005091751 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]) [X] 1, 6, 8-13, 15-16 * , entire document; * [Y] 7, 14 [A] 2-5, 17-20; | [A]US2008189866 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document; *; | [A]US2008289102 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document; *; | [Y]US2010024123 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]) [Y] 14 * , entire document; *; | [Y]US2017135879 (REINERS ANNE MARIE [US], et al) [Y] 7 * , entire document; *; | [AP]US2019091086 (EMERSON AARON J [US], et al) [AP] 1-20 * , entire document; * |