EP3810749 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATED CULTURE OF CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stemcell Technologies Canada Inc. 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAZARETH, Emanuel 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | 02 /
JERVIS, Eric 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | 03 /
O'KEANE, Martin 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | 04 /
FARIS, Carrick 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19822150.9 | 19.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CA50859 | Priority number, date | US201862686962P | 19.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862686962 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019241885 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810749 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, C12M1/00, C12M1/26, C12M1/36, C12M3/00, C12N1/00, C12N5/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
C12M33/04 (EP,KR,US);
C12M41/48 (EP,KR,US);
C12M23/20 (KR,US);
C12M23/48 (KR,US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US);
C12M41/44 (US);
C12M41/46 (KR,US);
C12N5/0696 (US);
G01N15/0612 (EP);
G01N15/1429 (EP);
G01N15/1433 (EP);
G01N15/01 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN KULTIVIERUNG VON ZELLEN | [2021/17] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATED CULTURE OF CELLS | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CULTURE AUTOMATISÉE DE CELLULES | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1598415 (AUTOM PARTNERSHIP CAMBRIDGE [GB]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0114] , [0148] , [0158] - [0161] - [0169] , [0170] , [0199]; figures 13,14 * [I] 3-15; | [I]US2018087021 (BLANCHARD ALAN [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0071] - [0076] - [0 79] , [0080] , [0093] , [0107] - [0109] - [0139] , [0140] , [0150] , [0151]; figure 3 * | International search | [Y]CA2607217 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-73; | [Y]CA2920667 (INVIVOSCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-73; | [X] - JAIN et al., "The Complete Automation of Cell Culture: Improvements for High-Throughput and High-Content Screening", J BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING, (20110901), vol. 16, no. 8, ISSN 1087-0571, pages 932 - 939, XP055664860 [X] 1-73 * . Whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1087057111413920 | [Y] - KONAGAYA et al., "Long-term maintenance of human induced pluripotent stem cells by automated cell culture system", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20151117), vol. 5, no. 16647, ISSN 2045-2322, XP055452278 [Y] 1-73 * . Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep16647 | [A] - DANISZEWSKI et al., "Automated Cell Culture Systems and Their Applications to Human Pluripotent Stem Cell Studies", SLAS TECHNOL., (20180800), vol. 23, no. 4, ISSN 2472-6311, pages 315 - 325, XP055664864 [A] - * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/2472630317712220 | [A] - KEMPNER et al., "A review of cell culture automation", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR LABORATORY AUTOMATION (JALA), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1535-5535(04)00183-2, (20020401), pages 56 - 62, URL: https://journals.sagepub.com/doi/full/10.1016/s1535-5535-04-00183-2, XP002486440 [A] - DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1535-5535(04)00183-2 |