EP3808618 - BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | ||
[2021/39] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAKURA Kyoshiro c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
02 /
AJIMA Toshiyuki c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUBARA Kenichiro c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
04 /
GOTO Daisuke c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
[2021/16] | |||
Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Straße 29 80336 München / DE | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 19822195.4 | 18.03.2019 | |
[2021/16] | |||
WO2019JP11082 | |||
Priority number, date | JP20180115135 | 18.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018115135 | |
[2021/16] | |||
Filing language | JA | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2019244426 | ||
Date: | 26.12.2019 | ||
Language: | JA | ||
[2019/52] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP3808618 | ||
Date: | 21.04.2021 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2021/16] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP3808618 | ||
Date: | 23.11.2022 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2022/47] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.12.2019 |
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | |
Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, B60T13/74 | [2021/16] |
CPC: |
B60T13/741 (EP);
B60T8/171 (EP,US);
B60T1/065 (US);
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | |
MA | Not yet paid | ||
MD | Not yet paid | ||
TN | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | BREMSSYSTEM | [2021/16] |
English: | BRAKE SYSTEM | [2021/16] | |
French: | SYSTÈME DE FREIN | [2021/16] | |
Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2020 | Translation filed | |
18.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | ||
18.01.2021 | Search fee paid | ||
18.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
18.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 18.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | |
04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
13.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
10.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | ||
10.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
10.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
BG | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
GB | 18.03.2023 | ||
IE | 18.03.2023 | ||
LU | 18.03.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
FR | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
[2024/51] | |||
Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4316213B (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0063]; figures 6-9 *; | |
[XA]JP2012159134 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1,5,8,9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0061]; figures 1-9 * [A] 2-4,6,7; | |||
[A]US2017291585 (KOBUNE TATSURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0045]; figures 3-6 *; | |||
[A]US2017321773 (LEE JOUNG HEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0052] - [0130]; figures 3-5 * | |||
International search | [A]JP2000018294 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-9* , paragraph [0021] (Family: none) *; | ||
[YA]JP2004124950 (TOKICO LTD) [Y] 9 * , paragraphs [0039]-[0046], fig. 4 (Family: none) * [A] 1-8; | |||
[A]JP2008133922 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-9 * , paragraph [0017] (Family: none) *; | |||
[YA]JP2012159134 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 9 * , paragraphs [0008]-[0044] (Family: none) * [A] 1-8 | |||
by applicant | JP2000018294 | ||
JP2004124950 | |||
JP2008133922 |