EP3811180 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RESPONSIVE AUTONOMOUS HARDWARE PERFORMANCE STATE CONTROL OF A PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABU SALAH, Hisham Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
ROTEM, Efraim Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 03 /
WEISSMANN, Eliezer Albert Switcher 10 34995 Haifa, HA / IL | 04 /
AIZIK, Yoni PO Box 1659 31015 Haifa, HA / IL | 05 /
LEDERMAN, Daniel D. Haifa, 3460311 / IL | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
ABU SALAH, Hisham Hermon 830 12438 Majdal shams, Z / IL | ||
02 /
ROTEM, Efraim 8 Vizo Street 34400 Haifa, HA / IL | |||
03 /
WEISSMANN, Eliezer Albert Switcher 10 34995 Haifa, HA / IL | |||
04 /
AIZIK, Yoni PO Box 1659 31015 Haifa, HA / IL | |||
05 /
LEDERMAN, Daniel D. Shdema 65, Apt. 7 2199017 Karmiel / IL | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/17] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19822419.8 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US26717 | Priority number, date | US201816013142 | 20.06.2018 Original published format: US201816013142 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019245634 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811180 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3811180 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/3206, G06F1/324, G06F1/3296 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G06F1/324 (EP,US);
G06F1/3206 (EP,US);
G06F1/3296 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | G06F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REAKTIVEN AUTONOMEN HARDWARE-LEISTUNGSZUSTANDSREGELUNG EINES PROZESSORS | [2021/17] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RESPONSIVE AUTONOMOUS HARDWARE PERFORMANCE STATE CONTROL OF A PROCESSOR | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉTAT DE PERFORMANCE MATÉRIELLE AUTONOME SENSIBLE D'UN PROCESSEUR | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 13.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010268968 (GHIASI SORAYA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0046]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2012185709 (WEISSMANN ELIEZER [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0050] - [0053] *; | [XI]US2016342198 (HSU JIH-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0039]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-15 | International search | [Y]US2011145555 (NAYAR NARESH [US], et al) [Y] 3-5, 7, 9-10, 12-15 , 17-21, 24-25 * See paragraph [0070]; and figure 6. *; | [XYA]US2016259392 (WEISSMANN ELIEZER [IL], et al) [X] 1-2, 8, 16, 22-23 * See paragraphs [0014], [0025], [0041], [0045], [0054]-[0055]; claims 2, 10; and figure 6. * [Y] 3-5, 7, 9-10, 12-15 , 17-21, 24-25 [A] 6, 11; | [A]US2017145925 (KUSUMI NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0037]-[0053]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2017373694 (ROITHMEIER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0024]; and figure 3. *; | [A]US2018120924 (WEISSMANN ELIEZER [IL], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0060]; and figure 4. * | by applicant | US2010268968 | US2016342198 |