EP3804153 - SERDES WITH JITTER INJECTION SELF STRESS MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIR, Ehud 531 Dalewood Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2S 0L3 / CA | 02 /
WONG, Henry 107 Encore Private Ottawa, Ontario K2E 0A4 / CA | 03 /
KROTNEV, Petar Ivanov 25 Beauly Street Ottawa, Ontario K2W 1E9 / CA | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19822551.8 | 14.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019CN91236 | Priority number, date | US201816011206 | 18.06.2018 Original published format: US201816011206 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242571 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804153 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3804153 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/20, H03M9/00, H04L1/00, H04B3/462, H04L25/03 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/0047 (EP);
H04L1/0042 (US);
H03M9/00 (EP);
H04L1/0045 (US);
H04L1/0058 (US);
H04L1/0072 (US);
H04L1/203 (EP);
H04B3/462 (EP);
H04L1/205 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | H04L1/20, H03M9/00, H04L1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/15] | H04B3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERDES MIT JITTER-INJEKTIONS-SELBSTSPANNUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2021/15] | English: | SERDES WITH JITTER INJECTION SELF STRESS MECHANISM | [2021/15] | French: | SERDES AVEC MÉCANISME D'AUTO-CONTRAINTE D'INJECTION DE GIGUE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2007230513 (TALBOT GERALD R [US], et al) [X] 1,12-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 2, 6-9, 12 * [A] 15-22 [Y] 8 [I] 3-7,9-11; | [A]US2009304054 (TONIETTO DAVIDE [CA], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0057] ** figures 6-8 *; | [YA]US2012170621 (TRACY PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0039] * * figure 1 * [A] 1-7,9-22; | [XAI]US2018052194 (LEE HAE CHANG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 4-9 * [A] 3-9,12-22 [I] 11 | International search | [A]US2005253617 (ROBERTS GORDON W [CA], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]CN1985459 (DFT MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101057154 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US8094705 (WATKINS DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US8228972 (TONIETTO DAVIDE [CA], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104954044 (UNIV BEIJING) [A] 1-22 * description, paragraphs [0018]-[0044], figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US2007230513 | US2009304054 | US2012170621 | US2018052194 |