EP3800839 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/14] | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, RELATED APPARATUS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2023/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Xinpeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Fei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhe Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 19823095.5 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/14] | WO2019CN92273 | Priority number, date | CN201810665970 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810665970 | [2021/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242729 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800839 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3800839 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/02, H04W36/00, H04L45/50, // H04W36/08, H04W40/36 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04W40/36 (EP);
H04L12/4633 (CN);
H04W36/0077 (US);
H04L45/24 (CN);
H04L45/34 (US);
H04L45/44 (CN);
H04L45/50 (EP);
H04L45/507 (EP);
H04L45/741 (CN);
H04W40/248 (EP);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W36/0019 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/023 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | H04L12/707, H04W36/02, H04W36/00, // H04W36/08, H04W40/36 | ||
Former IPC [2021/14] | H04L12/707 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/15] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2023/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2023/20] |
Former [2021/14] | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/14] | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, RELATED APPARATUS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/14] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, APPAREIL CONNEXE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE D'ORDINATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2020 | Translation filed | 28.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2088793 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [I]EP2187664 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2018019131 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [AP]EP3493487 (ZTE CORP [CN]) | International search | [A]CN101365239 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101548563 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2009296655 (TAMURA YOSHIO [JP]); | [A]WO2018079998 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |