EP3810755 - HIV TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nantcell, Inc. 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90232 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIAZI, Kayvan 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90230 / US | 02 /
SAFRIT, Jeffrey 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90230 / US | 03 /
LEE, John H. 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90230 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19823605.1 | 17.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US37537 | Priority number, date | US201862686846P | 19.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862686846 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019245993 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810755 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0783, A61K39/21, A61K39/395, A61K39/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/215 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/4406 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K38/1793 (EP);
A61K38/2086 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (US);
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4613 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/464838 (EP);
A61K47/68 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K14/70535 (US);
C07K16/1003 (EP,US);
C07K16/1045 (EP);
C07K16/1063 (US);
A61K2039/507 (EP);
C07K2317/732 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1793, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/2086, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIV | [2021/17] | English: | HIV TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2021/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU VIH | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2016022358 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [X]WO2016063251 (CT HOSPITALIER UNIVERSITAIRE VAUDOIS [CH], et al); | [X]WO2018013975 (VIRACTA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2018075989 (ALTOR BIOSCIENCE CORP [US], et al); |