EP3897920 - AN AIR TREATMENT METHOD AND A SYSTEM ARRANGED FOR TREATING AIR IN A CLEAN ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airlich IP ApS Sortemosevej 21 3450 Allerød / DK | [2024/02] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Infuser IP ApS Ole Maaløes Vej 5 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENØRN, Thomas Carl Plougs Vej 54 3460 Birkerød / DK | 02 /
INGEMAR, Jonas Baldersgade 18, 1. th. 2200 København N / DK | 03 /
BUTCHER, Andrew Alstedvej 16 2700 Brønshøj / DK | 04 /
CARSTENS, Cecilie Litske Vesterbrogade 77, 3. tv. 1620 København V / DK | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | Application number, filing date | 19823903.0 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019DK50392 | Priority number, date | DK2018PA70823 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: DK PA201870823 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125889 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897920 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/00, B01D53/86, F24F3/16 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B01D53/007 (EP,KR,US);
F24F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/8668 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2251/104 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/802 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/206 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | LUFTBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUFT IN EINEM REINRAUM ANGEORDNETES SYSTEM | [2021/43] | English: | AN AIR TREATMENT METHOD AND A SYSTEM ARRANGED FOR TREATING AIR IN A CLEAN ROOM | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'AIR ET SYSTÈME CONÇU POUR TRAITER L'AIR DANS UNE SALLE BLANCHE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 31.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2024 | Decision despatched | 13.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.03.2022 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2022/22] | 01.12.2023 | Resumption of proceedings | [2023/44] | 23.03.2022 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2023/44] | Cited in | International search | [XDI]EP0931581 (EBARA CORP [JP]); | [XI]US6558639 (WATANABE KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]US7198698 (RICHARDS JOHN R [US], et al); | [A]WO2007061401 (DANA UV INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US5626820 | EP0931581 | WO2016150465 |