EP3873369 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSISTING TOOL EXCHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFITHS, Paul G. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
HE, Xingchi 246 Olive Hill Drive San Jose, California 95125 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19824414.7 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US59172 | Priority number, date | US201862753762P | 31.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862753762 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092775 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873369 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B34/00, A61B90/50, A61B90/90, B25J15/04, A61B34/20 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B34/20 (EP);
A61B90/06 (US);
A61B90/50 (EP);
A61B90/90 (EP);
B25J15/0466 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES WERKZEUGWECHSELS | [2021/36] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSISTING TOOL EXCHANGE | [2021/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AIDE À L'ÉCHANGE D'OUTILS | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 13.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1815950 (EURATOM [BE]) [X] 1-8,11-16,26-34,36-41,43-47,54-61 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0039] , [0058] , [0091] * * figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 9,10,17-25,35,42,48-53; | [Y]US2012245596 (MEENINK HILDEBERT C M [NL]) [Y] 17,35,48,49 * paragraphs [0030] , [0046] ** figure 4 *; | [Y]US2015257841 (DACHS II GREGORY W [US]) [Y] 22-25,52,53 * paragraph [0067] *; | [Y]US2016151120 (KOSTRZEWSKI SZYMON [CH], et al) [Y] 9,10,18-20,42,50 * paragraphs [0080] , [0119] *; | [Y]WO2017210497 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [Y] 21,51 * paragraph [0065] * | by applicant | US2014276951 | US2015257841 | US2016361126 |