EP3813397 - NETWORK NODE AND BASE STATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOYAGI, Kenichiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
TAKEDA, Shinya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19824958.3 | 02.04.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019JP14651 | Priority number, date | JP20180120108 | 25.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018120108 | [2021/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020003677 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813397 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/90, H04W88/14, H04W92/04 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04W88/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W92/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04W4/90, H04W88/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | NETZWERKKNOTEN UND BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/17] | English: | NETWORK NODE AND BASE STATION APPARATUS | [2021/17] | French: | NOEUD DE RESEAU ET APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE | [2022/18] |
Former [2021/17] | N?UD DE RESEAU ET APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | Translation filed | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 20.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/08] | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2014158229 (SOFTBANK MOBILE CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US2017318445 (KODAYPAK RAJENDRA PRASAD [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0064] * * claims 1-7 * [I] 2,3; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Handling on E-UTRA cell where some PLMNs only have access to 5GC", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20170929), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1711109 HANDLING ON E-UTRA CELL WHERE SOME PLMNS ONLY HAVE ACCESS TO 5GC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_99bis/Docs/, (20170929), XP051355383 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * Middle of page 2: E-UTRA cell is shared by three PLMNs * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Technical realization of Cell Broadcast Service (CBS) (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 23.041, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180620), vol. CT WG1, no. V15.2.0, pages 1 - 93, XP051472884 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * Section "8.2 Duplication Detection Function" * | International search | [A]WO2018066235 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-6* , *; | [A] - HUAWEI et al., "Discussion on how to handle 5GC features for ng-eNB based on LS S2-175192", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #99 R2-1708394, Berlin, Germany, (20170820), vol. RAN WG2, XP051318258 [A] 1-6 | by applicant | JP2018120108 |