EP3815002 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPPORTUNISTIC LOAD BALANCING IN NEURAL NETWORKS USING METADATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2485 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALAYA, Nicholas c/o Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 7171 Southwest Pkwy Austin, Texas 78735 / US | 02 /
ECKERT, Yasuko c/o Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2002 - 156th Ave. NE Suite 300 Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19825016.9 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US33247 | Priority number, date | US201816019374 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: US201816019374 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020005412 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3815002 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/08, G06N3/04, G06N3/10, G06F9/50 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G06N3/082 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F9/5044 (US);
G06F9/3887 (CN);
G06F9/505 (CN,US);
G06F9/5066 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | G06N3/08, G06N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OPPORTUNISTISCHEN LASTVERTEILUNG IN NEURONALEN NETZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON METADATEN | [2021/18] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPPORTUNISTIC LOAD BALANCING IN NEURAL NETWORKS USING METADATA | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE OPPORTUNISTE DANS DES RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX À L'AIDE DE MÉTADONNÉES | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017344882 (AMBROSE JUDE ANGELO [AU], et al); | [A]US2018082181 (BROTHERS JOHN [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2013503398 ; | [A]US2016335119 (MERRILL THEODORE [US], et al); | [A]US2018068044 (ERICKSON ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US9916283 (ZARIBAFIYAN ARMAN [CA], et al); | [A]US2018082181 (BROTHERS JOHN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2018082181 |