EP3671855 - PIXEL DISPLAY MODULE AND MASK PLATE FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kunshan Go-Visionox Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. Building 4 No. 1 Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Mingxing Building 4 No. 1, Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 02 /
LI, Junfeng Building 4 No. 1, Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xuliang Building 4 No. 1, Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 04 /
LV, Dongyun Building 4 No. 1, Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 05 /
GAN, Shuaiyan Building 4 No. 1, Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 06 /
GAO, Feng Building 4 No. 1, Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19825098.7 | 27.05.2019 | [2020/26] | WO2019CN88556 | Priority number, date | CN201810679353 | 27.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810679353 | [2020/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001214 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671855 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, C23C14/04, H01L51/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C23C14/042 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K59/353 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K71/166 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H01L27/32, C23C14/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | PIXELANZEIGEMODUL UND MASKENPLATTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/26] | English: | PIXEL DISPLAY MODULE AND MASK PLATE FOR MAKING SAME | [2020/26] | French: | MODULE D'AFFICHAGE DE PIXELS ET PLAQUE DE MASQUE POUR SA FABRICATION | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 18.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007266943 (YEH HSIEN-HSIN [TW], et al); | [Y]WO2008093862 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [X]US2010039011 (KARAKI TETSUYA [JP], et al); | [Y]EP2950348 (KUNSHAN VISIONOX DISPLAY CO LTD [CN], et al); | [Y]US2016104413 (MATSUEDA YOJIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US9293516 (CHOI DEOK-YOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]CN105789261 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [A]CN106486513 (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]CN106653804 (TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al); | [PX]CN108598141 (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) |