EP3815078 - COMPUTERS FOR SUPPORTING MULTIPLE VIRTUAL REALITY DISPLAY DEVICES AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THAKUR, Anshuman 8900 SW 149th Pl Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
HONG, DongHo 4316 NW Chanticleer Drive Apt. M1 Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 03 /
VEERAMANI, Karthik 174 NE Greenridge Terrace Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | 04 /
TOMAR, Arvind 920 Sterling Cir Folsom, California 95630 / US | 05 /
INSKO, Brent 550 NW 19th Ave Apt. 313 Portland, Oregon 97209 / US | 06 /
KUWAHARA, Atsuo 7687 NW 168th Avenue Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 07 /
LI, Zhengmin 2747 NE 9th Dr. Hillsboro, Oregon 97224 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19825106.8 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US20272 | Priority number, date | US201816024153 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: US201816024153 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020005338 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3815078 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/12, G06T1/20, G09G5/00, A63F13/26, G06F3/14 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP,US);
G09G5/12 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (US);
G06F3/1431 (EP,US);
G09G5/001 (EP,US);
G09G5/003 (US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US);
A63F13/26 (EP,US);
A63F2300/8082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | G09G5/12, G06T1/20, G09G5/00, A63F13/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | COMPUTER ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG MEHRERER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGEN DER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2021/18] | English: | COMPUTERS FOR SUPPORTING MULTIPLE VIRTUAL REALITY DISPLAY DEVICES AND RELATED METHODS | [2021/18] | French: | ORDINATEURS POUR LA PRISE EN CHARGE DE MULTIPLES DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7808447 (COOK DAVID ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,2,5-12,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-5; claims 1-7 * [Y] 3,4,13,14; | [A]US2016093108 (MAO XIAODONG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0149]; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2017053620 (LAW HENRY HING [CA], et al) [Y] 3,4,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]WO2017152355 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 3,4,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0126]; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US2017330496 (ORAVAINEN JUHO HENRI RIKHARD [FI]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [P]EP3418879 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [AX]US7808447 (COOK DAVID ROBERT [US]) [A] 3,5,13-14,23-24 * See column 1, line 62 - column 6, line 7; claim 15; table 1; and figures 2, 4-5. * [X] 1,11,16,20-21; | [A]US2012274750 (STRONG STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0011], [0024], [0039], [0044]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2013021352 (WYATT DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,8,12,15,17-19,22,25 * See paragraphs [0030], [0058], [0073], [0077]; and figures 1, 2A, 3. *; | [Y]US2014026137 (VEMBU BALAJI [US], et al) [Y] 6-7,9-10 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0031], [0042], [0058]; and figures 2-3. *; | [A]US2015261291 (MIKHAILOV ANTON [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0053], [0095], [0145], [0156]; and figures 1B, 10. *; | [PX]US2018307042 (RIGUER GUENNADI [CA]) [PX] 1,7-11,16-18,20-21* See paragraphs [0010]-[0015], [0029]-[0042]; and figures 1, 3. * | by applicant | US7808447 |