EP3814838 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NONLINEAR OPTICAL LIGHT GENERATION USING LINEARLY UNCOUPLED RESONATORS IN INTEGRATED PHOTONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xanadu Quantum Technologies Inc. 777 Bay Street, Suite 2902 Toronto, Ontario M5G 2C8 / CA | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Xanadu Quantum Technologies Inc. 372 Richmond St. W, Suite 306 Toronto ON M5V1X6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LISCIDINI, Marco Via Luigi Terenzi 13 27100 Pavia / IT | 02 /
MENOTTI, Matteo 503-96 Saint Patrick Street Toronto, Ontario M5T 1V2 / CA | 03 /
MORRISON, Blair 50 Bruyeres Mews, Unit 1101 Toronto, Ontario M5V 0H8 / CA | 04 /
SIPE, John 1205 130 Carlton St. Toronto, Ontario M5A 4K3 / CA | 05 /
TAN, Kang Unit 4410, 386 Yonge Street Toronto, Ontario M5B 0A5 / CA | 06 /
VERNON, Zachary 1A-867 Dovercourt Road Toronto, Ontario M6H 2X4 / CA | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/28] | 01 /
LISCIDINI, Marco Via Luigi Terenzi, 13 27100 Pavia / IT | ||
02 /
MENOTTI, Matteo 503-96 Saint Patrick Street Toronto, Ontario M5T 1V2 / CA | |||
03 /
MORRISON, Blair 50 Bruyeres Mews, Unit 1101 Toronto, Ontario M5V 0H8 / CA | |||
04 /
SIPE, John 1205 130 Carlton St. Toronto, Ontario M5A 4K3 / CA | |||
05 /
TAN, Kang Unit 4410, 386 Yonge Street Toronto, Ontario M5B 0A5 / CA | |||
06 /
VERNON, Zachary 1A-867 Dovercourt Road Toronto, Ontario M6H 2X4 / CA | |||
Former [2021/18] | 01 /
LISCIDINI, Marco Via Luigi Terenzi, 13 27100 Pavia / IT | ||
02 /
MENOTTI, Matteo 503-96 Saint Patrick Street Toronto, Ontario M5T 1V2 / CA | |||
03 /
MORRISON, Blair 50 Bruyeres Mews, Unit 1101 Toronto, Ontario M5V 0H8 / CA | |||
04 /
SIPE, John 1205 130 Carlton St. Toronto, Ontario M5A 4K3 / CA | |||
05 /
TAN, Kang 318 Richmond St W Toronto, Ontario M5V 0B4 / CA | |||
06 /
VERNON, Zachary 1A-867 Dovercourt Road Toronto, Ontario M6H 2X4 / CA | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/18] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19826238.8 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019CA50899 | Priority number, date | US201862691680P | 29.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691680 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020000107 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814838 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3814838 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/39, // G02B6/293 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G02F1/39 (EP);
G02F1/3507 (US);
G02B6/29343 (EP,US);
G02F1/3503 (US);
G02F1/365 (US);
G02F1/3536 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | G02F1/39, G02B6/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR NICHTLINEAREN OPTISCHEN LICHTERZEUGUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG LINEAR ENTKOPPELTER RESONATOREN BEI NTEGRIERTEN FOTONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/18] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NONLINEAR OPTICAL LIGHT GENERATION USING LINEARLY UNCOUPLED RESONATORS IN INTEGRATED PHOTONIC DEVICES | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION DE LUMIÈRE OPTIQUE NON LINÉAIRE UTILISANT DES RÉSONATEURS NON COUPLÉS LINÉAIREMENT DANS DES DISPOSITIFS PHOTONIQUES INTÉGRÉS | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003128922 (KOLODZIEJSKI LESLIE [US], et al); | [X]WO2007014218 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010065710 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [X]US2010209038 (POPOVIC MILOS [US], et al); | [XY]US2015168803 (XU QING [CA], et al) | International search | [A]US2006197959 (BARWICZ TYMON [US], et al); | [A]US2016041032 (MATTHEWS JONATHAN C F [GB], et al); | [A]US2017212405 (PANT MIHIR [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003128922 | WO2007014218 | WO2010065710 | US2010209038 | US2015168803 |