EP3813682 - MEDICAL SYSTEMS INCORPORATING PULLEY SHARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auris Health, Inc. 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City CA 94065 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUH, Travis, Michael 150 Shoreline Drive Redwood City, California 94065 / US | 02 /
WOODLEY, Bruce, R. 3130 Waverley Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Brunner, John Michael Owen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19826643.9 | 24.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US38770 | Priority number, date | US201862691374P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691374 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020005854 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813682 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B34/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
A61B34/35 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,KR);
A61B17/00234 (KR);
A61B34/20 (EP,KR);
A61B34/71 (EP,KR,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,KR,US);
A61G13/10 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00323 (KR);
A61B2034/105 (EP);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,KR);
A61B2034/2059 (EP,KR);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,KR);
A61B2034/301 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/305 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/306 (KR);
A61B2090/306 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/309 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/3614 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE SYSTEME MIT GEMEINSAMER UMLENKROLLE | [2021/18] | English: | MEDICAL SYSTEMS INCORPORATING PULLEY SHARING | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES MÉDICAUX INCORPORANT UN PARTAGE DE POULIE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010016853 (BURBANK WILLIAM A [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 3a,3b ** paragraph [0040] *; | [X]US2015150635 (KILROY PABLO EDUARDO GARCIA [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0163] - [0171]; figures 13a,13b,14a * * figure 3b *; | [X]DE102015118914 (GOTTFRIED WILHELM LEIBNIZ UNIVERSITÄT HANNOVER [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0037]; figures 2a,2b * | International search | [A]US2010011901 (BURBANK WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1-30* , entire document *; | [A]US2015127045 (PRESTEL STEPHAN [DE]) [A] 1-30 * , entire document *; | [X]US2018055583 (SCHUH TRAVIS [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 13-30 * , entire document *; | [X]WO2018069679 (CAMBRIDGE MEDICAL ROBOTICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1, 9-12 * , entire document * | by applicant | US2015150635 | DE102015118914 |