EP3783965 - BASE STATION DEVICE ENERGY-SAVING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Liangren Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19826690.0 | 12.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019CN82458 | Priority number, date | CN201810682368 | 27.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810682368 | [2021/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001129 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783965 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04W28/02, H04W28/08, H04W24/02 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP,CN,US);
G06F1/266 (US);
H04W28/0231 (US);
H04W52/0203 (CN);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W52/0277 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | ENERGIESPARVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BASISSTATION | [2021/08] | English: | BASE STATION DEVICE ENERGY-SAVING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE DE DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2020 | Translation filed | 16.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011101779 (PATEL PRANAV N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13,15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0048] * [I] 3-6,9-11,14; | [A]US2016241031 (HOOSHMAND ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2011034476 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [Y]CN102239730 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-22 * claims 1-5, and description, paragraphs 29-41 *; | [A]CN104053162 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]CN106332124 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [Y]CN106507450 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [Y] 1-22 * claim 1, and description, paragraphs 5-23 *; | [A]CN106961716 (NORTH CHINA ELECTRIC POWER UNIV (BAODING)) [A] 1-22 * entire document * |