EP3778318 - WIPER OPERATION SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UETA, Toshiro c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, 731-5161 Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Yuta c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, 731-5161 Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
TSURUDA, Jun c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, 731-5161 Hiroshima / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19826899.7 | 24.05.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP20736 | Priority number, date | JP20180119663 | 25.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018119663 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020003837 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778318 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778318 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08, E02F9/26 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
B60S1/08 (EP,US);
B60S1/0807 (US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/22 (EP);
E02F9/0858 (EP);
E02F9/264 (EP);
B60K2360/135 (EP);
B60K2360/1523 (EP);
B60K2360/61 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | B60S1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WISCHERBETRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE | [2021/07] | English: | WIPER OPERATION SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACTIONNEMENT D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | Translation filed | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | IE | 24.05.2023 | LU | 24.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
IE | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009096433 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [XA]US2010181171 (KAWACHI KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * figure - * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0111] * [A] 2-4; | [A]US2016258134 (MATSUMOTO HAYATO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure - * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054] * | International search | [A]KR20070041189 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009096433 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1 * , paragraphs [0028]-[0031], [0038], fig. 3-4 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP5572770B (KOMATSU LTD.) [Y] 1 * , paragraphs [0040], [0045], fig. 1-2, 4 * [A] 2-4; | [A]JP2017179806 (SUMITOMO SHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2010105613 |