EP3817106 - POSITIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, POSITIVE ELECTRODE, POWER STORAGE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POSITIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO Chisato c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
YANO Masaya c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
TAKE Hiroyoshi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19827365.8 | 25.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019JP25192 | Priority number, date | JP20180121332 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018121332 | [2021/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020004398 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817106 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/60, H01G11/48, H01G11/84, H01M4/137, H01M4/36, H01M10/0567 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
H01G11/02 (EP,US);
H01M4/602 (KR,US);
H01G11/04 (EP);
H01G11/48 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/56 (EP);
H01G11/84 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/137 (EP,KR);
H01M4/1399 (EP);
H01M4/366 (KR);
H01M4/606 (EP);
H01M4/624 (US);
H01G11/62 (EP,US);
H01G11/64 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0025 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL, POSITIVE ELEKTRODE, ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALS | [2021/18] | English: | POSITIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, POSITIVE ELECTRODE, POWER STORAGE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POSITIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL | [2021/18] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | Translation filed | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 31.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2018026341 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-6, 9-10, 13 * , paragraphs [0029]-[0030], [0035]-[0036], [0076], [0081]-[0084], examples 1-6, comparative examples 1-5, fig. 1 & EP 3477746 A1, paragraphs [0029]-[0031], [0036]-[0037], [0075], [0080]-[0083], examples 1-6, comparative examples 1-5, fig. 1 & CN 109496372 A & KR 10-2019-0032390 A * [Y] 7-8, 11-12; | [Y]JP2015144073 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 7-8, 11-12 * , paragraphs [0048]-[0049], [0079] & WO 2015/115243 A1, paragraphs [0048]-[0049], [0079] *; | [A]WO2014092016 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * , claims 1-7, paragraphs [0021], [0054] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014130706 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-13 * , claims 1-2, 5-6, example 1 & US 2014/0186703 A1, claims 1-2, 5-6, example 1 & KR 10-2014-0086875 A * | by applicant | JP2014120227 | JP2018026341 |