EP3897561 - PROCESS FOR DYEING KERATIN MATERIALS USING A DIRECT DYE AND AN UNSATURATED HETEROCYCLIC SALT, AND COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SABELLE, Stéphane L'OREAL R&I AULNAY 1, ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 AULNAY-SOUS-BOIS / FR | 02 /
GUERARD, Olivier L'OREAL R&I AULNAY 1, ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 AULNAY-SOUS-BOIS / FR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | L'Oreal Service D.I.P.I. 9, rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19827689.1 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP85636 | Priority number, date | FR20180074060 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1874060 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020127255 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897561 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/35, A61Q5/06 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
A61K8/4926 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/35 (KR);
A61K8/355 (EP,KR);
A61K8/41 (KR);
A61K8/4946 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4953 (US);
A61K8/496 (US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN VON KERATINSUBSTANZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DIREKTFARBSTOFFS UND EINES UNGESÄTTIGTEN HETEROCYCLISCHEN SALZES UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2021/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR DYEING KERATIN MATERIALS USING A DIRECT DYE AND AN UNSATURATED HETEROCYCLIC SALT, AND COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COLORATION DE MATIÈRES KÉRATINIQUES À L'AIDE D'UN COLORANT DIRECT ET D'UN SEL HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE INSATURÉ, ET COMPOSITION LE COMPRENANT | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 21.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4519947 (HATTORI MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [A]EP1362572 (OREAL [FR]); | [XY]DE102005032798 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [X]DE102006017901 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [Y]US2007251028 (SAMAIN HENRI [FR], et al) | by applicant | GB738585 | FR1221122 | FR1516943 | FR1540423 | FR1560664 | FR1567219 | GB1195386 | US3524842 | FR2189006 | FR2275462 | FR2285851 | DE2527638 | DE2538363 | FR2570946 | DE4137005 | DE4220388 | WO9501772 | WO9515144 | EP0714954 | WO9744004 | US5708151 | FR2757385 | EP0850636 | EP0850637 | EP0860636 | US5879413 | US5888252 | EP0918053 | EP0920856 | WO9948465 | FR2788433 | EP1062940 | WO0166646 | EP1133975 | EP1133976 | WO03029359 | WO2015000144 | GB19740027645 |