EP3897957 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYAMIDE MICROCAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELABBADI, Amal Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
JACQUEMOND, Marlène Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 03 /
BERTHIER, Damien Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 04 /
OUALI, Lahoussine Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 05 /
NICOLAE, Anaick Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19827719.6 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP86329 | Priority number, date | EP20180214079 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18214079 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020127749 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897957 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/16, A01N25/28, C11D3/50 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C11D3/505 (EP);
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
A01N25/28 (EP,US);
C08L77/04 (US);
C11D17/0039 (EP);
C11D3/3719 (EP);
C11D3/50 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYAMIDMIKROKAPSELN | [2021/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYAMIDE MICROCAPSULES | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MICROCAPSULES DE POLYAMIDE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1142649 (WALLACE & TIERNAN INC); | [XAI]US3429827 (RUUS HENN); | [XI]US4307169 (MATKAN JOSEF); | [A]US4640709 (BEESTMAN GEORGE B [US]); | [XA]JPH10226749 (LION CORP); | [X]EP2468239 (PROCTER & GAMBLE INTERNAT OPERATIONS SA [CH]); | by applicant | EP0946133 | WO2007004166 | EP2300146 | WO2012007438 | WO2013026657 | WO2018115250 |