EP3899680 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A MINING AND/OR CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epiroc Rock Drills Aktiebolag 701 91 Örebro / SE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUSTAVSSON, Hans Sigillgatan 55 703 78 ÖREBRO / SE | 02 /
BRAY, Peter Oskarsvägen 10 702 14 ÖREBRO / SE | 03 /
HILDINGSSON, Arne Södra Mosvägen 4 692 32 KUMLA / SE | 04 /
TINGÖ, Per Järnvägsgatan 1 695 30 LAXÅ / SE | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Epiroc Rock Drills AB Patents 701 91 Örebro / SE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19827862.4 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019SE51311 | Priority number, date | SE20180051620 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: SE 1851620 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020130921 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899680 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, E21B7/02 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
G05D1/0234 (EP);
E21B7/02 (SE);
E21B7/022 (EP);
E21D9/003 (SE);
G05D1/43 (SE);
G06T7/70 (SE);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINER BERGBAU- UND/ODER BAUMASCHINE | [2021/43] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A MINING AND/OR CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA POSITION D'UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION ET/OU D'EXPLOITATION MINIÈRE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2006057238 (ENZAN KOBO KK); | [A]WO2008100201 (ATLAS COPCO ROCK DRILLS AB [SE], et al); | [XI]WO2015106799 (SANDVIK MINING & CONSTR OY [FI]) |