EP3884672 - CURRENT PICTURE REFERENCING BLOCK VECTOR INITIALIZATION WITH DUAL TREE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/51] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POIRIER, Tangi c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 02 /
LELEANNEC, Fabrice c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 03 /
GALPIN, Franck c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Rittner, Karsten Rittner & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Schiffgraben 17 30159 Hannover / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19827874.9 | 19.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019US62088 | Priority number, date | EP20180306529 | 20.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18306529 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020106653 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884672 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/186, H04N19/176, H04N19/11, H04N19/513, H04N19/52, H04N19/593, H04N19/105, H04N19/119, H04N19/159, H04N19/70, H04N19/96 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (EP);
H04N19/11 (EP);
H04N19/119 (EP);
H04N19/159 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/513 (EP);
H04N19/52 (EP);
H04N19/593 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | AUF GEGENWÄRTIGES BILD REFERENZIERENDE BLOCKVEKTORINITIALISIERUNG MIT DOPPELBAUM | [2021/39] | English: | CURRENT PICTURE REFERENCING BLOCK VECTOR INITIALIZATION WITH DUAL TREE | [2021/39] | French: | INITIALISATION DE VECTEUR DE BLOC DE RÉFÉRENCEMENT D'IMAGE COURANTE À ARBRE DOUBLE | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 20.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2017206803 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]); |