EP3890859 - PROCESS FOR PURIFYING TETRAHYDROCANNABINOL USING A CHROMATOGRAPHIC STATIONARY PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orochem Technologies, Inc. 340 Shuman Boulevard Naperville, IL 60563 / US | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OROSKAR, Anil 104 Livery Circle Oak Brook, Illinois 60523 / US | 02 /
GULATI, Kunal 340 Shuman Boulevard Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US | 03 /
HOUSE, David 716 E. Oakton Street Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US | 04 /
OROSKAR, Asha 104 Livery Circle Oak Brook, Illinois 60523 / US | 05 /
OROSKAR, Gautham 104 Livery Circle Oak Brook, Illinois 60523 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19828005.9 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019US64031 | Priority number, date | US201862775222P | 04.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862775222 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020117688 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3890859 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/18, B01D15/26, A61K31/352, C07D311/80 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B01D15/265 (EP);
C07D311/80 (EP,US);
B01D15/1821 (EP);
B01D15/1871 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON TETRAHYDROCANNABINOL UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER CHROMATOGRAFISCHEN STATIONÄREN PHASE | [2021/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR PURIFYING TETRAHYDROCANNABINOL USING A CHROMATOGRAPHIC STATIONARY PHASE | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE TÉTRAHYDROCANNABINOL À L'AIDE D'UNE PHASE STATIONNAIRE CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2017194173 (SYMRISE AG [DE]) [Y] 5-10 * page 12, line 25 - page 14, line 28; claim - * [A] 1; | [XP]WO2019010419 (OROCHEM TECH INC [US]) [XP] 1-11 * claim - *; | [XP]WO2019173582 (SOCATI TECH [US]) [XP] 1-11 * page 52, line 23 - page 56, line 9; claim - *; | [XY]WO03061563 (UNIV MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CT [US]) [X] 1-4,11 * example -; claim - * [Y] 5-10; | [X]WO2018187500 (UNIV MISSISSIPPI [US]) [X] 1-4,11 * example - * | by applicant | US2985589 |