EP3918407 - HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY WITH MULTIFOCAL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIN, Yi 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
CAKMAKCI, Ozan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
QIN, Yi Mountain View, California 94043 / US | ||
02 /
CAKMAKCI, Ozan Mountain View, California 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19828079.4 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019US64409 | Priority number, date | US201962863552P | 19.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962863552 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020256770 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918407 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02F1/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G02B2027/0185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGE MIT MULTIFOKUSMODUL | [2021/49] | English: | HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY WITH MULTIFOCAL MODULE | [2021/49] | French: | CASQUE IMMERSIF AVEC MODULE MULTIFOCAL | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 03.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US9507066 (KOLLIN JOEL S [US], et al); | [X]US2017160518 (LANMAN DOUGLAS ROBERT [US], et al); | [X]US2018239146 (BIERHUIZEN SERGE [US], et al); | [XY]US2018284464 (LU LU [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US9507066 (KOLLIN JOEL S [US], et al); | [X]US2017160518 (LANMAN DOUGLAS ROBERT [US], et al); | [X]US2018239146 (BIERHUIZEN SERGE [US], et al); | [XY]US2018284464 (LU LU [US], et al) |