EP3884741 - SWITCHING CABINET SYSTEM CONSISTING OF A BASE MODULE AND FUNCTIONAL MODULES, AND FUNCTIONAL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckhoff Automation GmbH Hülshorstweg 20 33415 Verl / DE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKHOFF, Hans Weidenweg 58 33415 Verl / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19829174.2 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019EP86359 | Priority number, date | DE201810133647 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018133647 | [2021/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020136084 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884741 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3884741 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H05K7/1465 (EP,US);
H05K7/1467 (US);
H05K7/1468 (EP,US);
H05K7/1477 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTSCHRANKSYSTEM AUS BASISMODUL UND FUNKTIONSMODULEN SOWIE FUNKTIONSMODUL | [2021/39] | English: | SWITCHING CABINET SYSTEM CONSISTING OF A BASE MODULE AND FUNCTIONAL MODULES, AND FUNCTIONAL MODULE | [2021/39] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ARMOIRE DE DISTRIBUTION COMPRENANT UN MODULE DE BASE ET DES MODULES FONCTIONNELS AINSI QUE MODULE FONCTIONNEL | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0236711 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-28 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1-5,9,10 *; | [A]WO2004057937 (DEMAG ERGOTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 7 - page 9; figures 1,2 *; | [XAYI]DE102011110184 (PILZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6,14-19,21 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0094]; figures 1-4,6-6b * [A] 12,28 [Y] 13,25,26 [I] 7-11,20,22-24,27; | [A]EP2793540 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-28* column 2 - column 6; figures 1-6 *; | [YA]WO2015063292 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 13,25,26 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-12,14-24,27,28; | [A]EP3018983 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-28 * column 5 - column 8; figures 1-7 * | Examination | EP0661915 | US2004201972 | DE102012213281 | by applicant | DE10006879 |