EP3897488 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR IMPROVING ENVIRONMENTAL PERCEPTION FOR BLIND OR VISUALLY IMPAIRED USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Briand, Pierre 4 Rue Aristide Briand 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19829281.5 | 15.11.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019FR52721 | Priority number, date | FR20180073115 | 17.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873115 | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128173 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897488 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3897488 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/08, A61H3/06, G06F3/01, A61B5/11, A61B3/113 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
A61F9/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B3/113 (IL,KR);
A61H3/061 (EP,IL,KR);
G06F3/013 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06V20/20 (IL,KR);
G09B21/003 (IL,KR);
H04N7/18 (IL,US);
A61H2003/063 (IL,KR);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINPRODUKT ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER UMGEBUNGSWAHRNEHMUNG FÜR BLINDE ODER SEHBEHINDERTE BENUTZER | [2021/43] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE FOR IMPROVING ENVIRONMENTAL PERCEPTION FOR BLIND OR VISUALLY IMPAIRED USERS | [2021/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL D'AIDE À LA PERCEPTION D'ENVIRONNEMENT POUR DES UTILISATEURS AVEUGLES OU MALVOYANTS | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 07.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2023 | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | ES | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | IT | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
IT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007016425 (WARD KOREN [AU]); | [A]US2007041600 (ZACHMAN JAMES M [US]); | [A]WO2013018090 (ABIR ELIAHU [IL]); | [A]US2018249151 (FREEMAN MICHAEL HAYES [US], et al) |