EP4069784 - AMINOACRIDINE AND AMINOPYRENE DYES AND THEIR USE AS FLUORESCENT TAGS, IN PARTICULAR FOR CARBOHYDRATE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOMIN, Maksim A. Im Kolke 8 37083 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
SAVICHEVA, Elizaveta Bunsenstrasse 16, z. 164 37073 Göttingen / DE | 03 /
SEIKOWSKI, Jan Über den Höfen 12 37077 Göttingen / DE | 04 /
BELOV, Vladimir Immanuel-Kant-Strasse 34 37083 Göttingen / DE | 05 /
HELL, Stefan W. Herzberger Landstrasse 38 37085 Göttingen / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 19829408.4 | 06.12.2019 | [2022/41] | WO2019EP84067 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110280 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069784 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09B15/00, C09B57/00, G01N33/53 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
C09B15/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,US);
C09B57/001 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (US);
G01N33/6803 (US);
C09K2211/1011 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | AMINOACRIDIN- UND AMINOPYRENFARBSTOFFE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS FLUORESZENZMARKER, INSBESONDERE FÜR KOHLENHYDRATANALYSE | [2022/41] | English: | AMINOACRIDINE AND AMINOPYRENE DYES AND THEIR USE AS FLUORESCENT TAGS, IN PARTICULAR FOR CARBOHYDRATE ANALYSIS | [2022/41] | French: | COLORANTS AMINOACRIDINE ET AMINOPYRÈNE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MARQUEURS FLUORESCENTS, EN PARTICULIER POUR L'ANALYSE DES HYDRATES DE CARBONE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/26] | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5641390 (HAWKE DAVID HARRY [US], et al) [X] 17 * column 2; examples 1-2 *[A] 18-20; | [AD]WO2012027717 (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US], et al) [AD] 1,4,5,8,9,11-23 * page 35 - page 36; compounds 21-22 *; | [XA]WO2013033046 (VIGH GYULA [US], et al) [X] 17 * page 48, line 18 - line 20; compound (IV) * * page 52, line 16 - line 25 * * figure 21 * [A] 1,4,5,8,9,11-16,18-23; | [IDA]US9127164 (RAMAGE ROBERT [GB], et al) [ID] 1-3,5,9-23 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 46; claim 11 * * column 47; claim 12 * [A] 6,7; | [XAI] - RAMON A. EVANGELISTA ET AL, "Characterization of 9-Aminopyrene-1,4,6-trisulfonate Derivatized Sugars by Capillary Electrophoresis with Laser-Induced Fluorescence Detection", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19950701), vol. 67, no. 13, doi:10.1021/ac00109a051, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2239 - 2245, XP055723886 [X] 17 * page 2239 - page 2240 * * page 2241; figure 1 * * page 2242; figure 2a * * page 2244; figure 6 * [A] 2,3,6-8,10 [I] 1,4,5,9,11-16,18-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00109a051 | by applicant | WO02099424 | WO2009112791 | EP2112506 | WO2010116142 | US2011039289 | WO2011127406 | WO2012027717 | US2012220537 | WO2013093481 | US9127164 | US2017369431 | - "Capillary electrophoresis of carbohydrates", N. VOLPI, From monosaccharides to complex polysaccharides, Humana Press, (20110000), pages 1 - 51 | - M.-L. RIEKKOLAJ. A. JONSSONR. M. SMITH, Pure Appl. Chem., (20040000), vol. 76, pages 443 - 451 | - D. N. HEIGER, "High performance capillary electrophoresis. An introduction: a primer", Agilent Technologies, Germany, (20000000), vol. 70, pages 19 - 24 | - H. H. LAUERG. P. ROZING, "High Performance Capillary Electrophoresis. A Primer", Agilent Technologies, (20090000), pages 17,60 - 65,157-159 | - NOVOTNY, M. VALLEY, W. R., "Recent trends in analytical and structural glycobiology", Curr. Opin. Chem. Biol., (20130000), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 832 - 840 | - LU, G.CRIHFIELD, C. L.GATTU, S.VELTRI, L. M.HOLLAND, L. A., Chem. Rev., (20180000), vol. 118, pages 7867 - 7885 | - K.R. ANUMULA, Anal. Biochem., (20060000), vol. 350, pages 1 - 23 | - W. LAROYR. CONTRERASN. CALLEWAERT, Nat. Protoc., (20060000), vol. 1, pages 397 - 405 | - EVANGELISTA, R. A.LIU, M.-S.CHEN, F.-T. A., Anal. Chem., (19950000), vol. 67, pages 2239 - 2245 | - PABST, M.KOLARICH D.POLTL, G.DALIK, T.LUBEC, G.HOFINGER, A.ALTMANN, F., Anal. Biochem., (20090000), vol. 384, pages 263 - 273 | - H.-T. FENGP. LIG. RUIJ. STRAYS. KHANS.-M. CHENS. F. Y. LI, Electrophoresis, (20170000), vol. 38, pages 1788 - 1799 | - V T. SKRIPKINAN. N. DYKHANOVV P. MAKSIMETSL. D. SHCHERBAK, Chem. Heterocycl. Compd., (19710000), vol. 7, pages 107 - 109 | - A. SZYMANSKAW. WICZKL. LANKIEWICZ, Chem. Heterocycl. Compd., (20000000), vol. 36, pages 801 - 808 | - P. YANGQ. YANGX. QIANL. TONGX. LI, J. Photochem. Photobiol. B, Biol., (20060000), vol. 84, pages 221 - 226 | - G. GELLERMANV GAISINT. BRIDER, Tetrahedron Lett., (20100000), vol. 51, pages 418 - 421 | - E. W. BAXTERA. B. REITZ, Organic Reactions, (20020000), pages 1 - 125 | - J. R. GOODELLB. SVENS-SOND. M. FERGUSON, J. Chem. Inf. Model., (20060000), vol. 46, pages 876 - 883 | - B. HACHEL. BRETTS. SHAKYA, Tetrahedron Lett., (20110000), vol. 52, pages 3625 - 3629 | - A. ALBERTR. GOLDACRE, J. Chem. Soc., (19460000), vol. 706 | - SHARETT, Z.GAMSEY, S.HIRAYAMA, L.VILOZNY, B.SURI, J. T.WESSLING, R. A.SINGARAM; B., Org. Biomol. Chem., (20090000), vol. 7, pages 1461 - 1470 | - C. HANSCHA. LEOR. W. TAFT, Chem. Rev., (19910000), vol. 91, pages 165 - 195 | - D. H. MCDANIELH. C. BROWN, J. Org. Chem., (19580000), vol. 23, pages 420 - 427 | - H. ZOLLINGERC. WITTWER, Helv. Chim. Acta, (19530000), vol. 36, pages 1711 - 1722 | - LI, T.GIASSON, R., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19940000), vol. 116, pages 9890 - 9893 | - ITOH, T.MASE, T., Org. Lett., (20040000), vol. 6, pages 4587 - 4590 | - MISPELAERE-CANIVET, C.SPINDLER, J.-F.PERRIO, S.BESLIN, P., Tetrahedron, (20050000), vol. 61, pages 5253 - 5259 | - E. BLOCKJ.-A. LAFITTE, J. Org. Chem., (19860000), vol. 51, pages 3428 - 3435 | - SCHULTZ, H. S.FREYERMUTH, H. B.BUC, S. R., J. Org. Chem., (19630000), vol. 28, pages 1140 - 1142 | - A. KLIEGLL. SCHAIBLE, Chem. Ber., (19570000), vol. 90, pages 60 - 65 | - K. SINGHG. SINGH, Indian J. Pharm., (19520000), vol. 14, pages 47 - 49 | - T. A. DAVISM. W. DANNEMANJ. N. JOHNSTON, Chem. Comm., (20120000), vol. 48, pages 5578 - 5580 | WO2019EP51396 |