EP3876964 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PARABACTEROIDES BACTERIAL STRAINS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Interruption | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULDER, Imke Elisabeth c/o 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | 02 /
ETTORRE, Anna c/o 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | 03 /
AHMED, Suaad c/o 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | 04 /
FOTIADOU, Parthena c/o 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19829463.9 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019EP84994 | Priority number, date | EP20180212087 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18212087 | GB20190016001 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: GB 201916001 | WO2019EP80131 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: PCT/EP2019/080131 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120717 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876964 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P35/00, A61K39/00 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61K35/741 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K35/74 (US);
A61K31/706 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2035/115 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,IL);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | 10.06.2021 | ME | 10.06.2021 | Validation states | MA | 10.06.2021 | MD | 10.06.2021 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT PARABACTEROIDEN BAKTERIENSTÄMMEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2021/37] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PARABACTEROIDES BACTERIAL STRAINS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2021/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES SOUCHES BACTÉRIENNES PARABACTEROIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2021/37] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 10.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 17.03.2023 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2023/30] | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2016149449 (UNIV TUFTS [US]) [YD] 1-21 * claims 1, 2 *; | [AD]WO2016203220 (4D PHARMA RES LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-21 * page 1 - page 5 *; | [XY]WO2018094190 (SANFORD BURNHAM PREBYS MEDICAL DISCOVERY INST [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-17 * page 1, line 20 - page 8, line 12; claims 26-28 * [Y] 1-27; | [ID]WO2018112365 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [ID] 1-21 * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2018112363 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * claims 1, 2 *; | [I] - GAR YEE KOH ET AL, "Parabacteroides distasonis attenuates toll-like receptor 4 signaling and Akt activation and blocks colon tumor formation in high-fat diet-fed azoxymethane-treated mice : Parabacteroides distasonis and colon tumorigenesis", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, US, (20180903), vol. 143, no. 7, doi:10.1002/ijc.31559, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 1797 - 1805, XP055576356 [I] 1-15 *Discussion* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.31559 | [Y] - DANKNER MATTHEW ET AL, "Classifying BRAF alterations in cancer: new rational therapeutic strategies for actionable mutations", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP UK, LONDON, vol. 37, no. 24, doi:10.1038/S41388-018-0171-X, ISSN 0950-9232, (20180315), pages 3183 - 3199, (20180315), XP036604861 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41388-018-0171-x | [Y] - JHEN-WEI RUAN ET AL, "Dual-specificity phosphatase 6 deficiency regulates gut microbiome and transcriptome response against diet-induced obesity in mice", NATURE MICROBIOLOGY, (20161128), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.1038/nmicrobiol.2016.220, pages 1 - 12, XP055580771 [Y] 3 * page 1, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmicrobiol.2016.220 | [Y] - NEERAJ LAL ET AL, "KRAS Mutation and Consensus Molecular Subtypes 2 and 3 Are Independently Associated with Reduced Immune Infiltration and Reactivity in Colorectal Cancer", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20171023), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-17-1090, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 224 - 233, XP055673689 [Y] 22-27 * abstract * *Discussion* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-17-1090 | by applicant | WO03046580 | WO2013008039 | WO2013050792 | WO2014167338 | WO2016149449 | WO2016203220 | WO2018094190 | WO2018112365 | WO2018112363 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. P15056 | - SPOR et al., Nat Rev Microbiol., (20110000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 279 - 90 | - ECKBURG et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 308, no. 5728, pages 1635 - 8 | - MACPHERSON et al., Microbes Infect., (20010000), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1021 - 35 | - MACPHERSON et al., Cell Mol Life Sci., (20020000), vol. 59, no. 12, pages 2088 - 96 | - MAZMANIAN et al., Cell, (20050000), vol. 122, no. 1, pages 107 - 18 | - FRANK et al., PNAS, (20070000), vol. 104, no. 34, pages 13780 - 5 | - SCANLAN et al., J Clin Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 44, no. 11, pages 3980 - 8 | - KANG et al., Inflamm Bowel Dis., (20100000), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 2034 - 42 | - MACHIELS et al., Gut, (20130000), vol. 63, no. 8, pages 1275 - 83 | - GOLDINGORBACH, Clin Infect Dis., (20080000), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 96 - 100 | - AZAD et al., BMJ, (20130000), vol. 347, page f6471 | - KOH et al., International Journal of Cancer, vol. 143, no. 7, pages 1797 - 1805 | - WU et al., Gut | - SAKAMOTOBENNO, Int J Syst Evol Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 56, pages 1599 - 605 | - MASCO et al., Systematic and Applied Microbiology, (20030000), vol. 26, pages 557 - 563 | - SRUTKOVA et al., J. Microbiol. Methods, (20110000), vol. 87, no. 1, pages 10 - 6 | - LIU et al., Acta Pharmaceutica Sinica B, (20180000), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 552 - 562 | - KUBICABREWER, Mayo ClinProc, (20120000), vol. 87, no. 1, pages 991 - 1003 | - VIGUER et al., J Immunol, (20040000), vol. 173, pages 1444 - 1453 | - MCCARTER et al., Ann Surg Oncol., (20070000), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 2854 - 60 | - DANKNER et al., Oncogene, (20180000), vol. 37, pages 3183 - 3199 | - JONES et al., J Clin Oncol., (20170810), vol. 35, no. 23, pages 2624 - 2630 | - ASCIERTO et al., Journal of Translational Medicine, (20120000), vol. 10, page 85 | - SOLTANI MH et al., Am J Pathol, (20050000), vol. 166, pages 1841 - 50 | - XIE, Med Res Rev, (20160000), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 300 - 312 | - SHI et al., Cancer Discov, (20140000), vol. 4, pages 80 - 93 | - MIYAMOTO-SHINOHARA et al., J. Gen. Appl. Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 54, pages 9 - 24 | - LESLIE et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 61, pages 3592 - 3597 | - MITROPOULOU et al., J Nutr Metab., (20130000), vol. 716861 | - KAILASAPATHY et al., Curr Issues Intest Microbiol., (20020000), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 39 - 48 | - STROBEL, Methods Mol Biol., (20090000), vol. 581, pages 247 - 61 | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, Blackwell Scientific Publications, (19860000), vol. I-IV | - LIVAKSCHMITTGEN, Methods, (20010000), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 402 - 8 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - THANGARAJU et al., Cancer Res., (20090000), vol. 67, no. 9, pages 2826 - 2832 | - QIN et al., Oncol Res., (20110000), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 573 - 582 | - BRONTE et al., Immunity, (20130000), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 806 - 818 | - BERRAONDO, British Journal of Cancer, (20190000), vol. 120, pages 6 - 15 | - YAN et al., Immunotherapy, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 347 - 360 | - NILU, Cancer Med., (20180000), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 4509 - 4516 | - FABBI et al., Mediators of Inflammation, (20170000), pages 1 - 14 | - ABEL et al., Front. Immunol., (20180000), vol. 9, page 1869 | - MORVANLANIER, Nature Reviews Cancer, (20160000), vol. 16, pages 7 - 19 |