EP3819630 - REACTION TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Go!Foton, Inc. 5-4-2 Tokodai Tsukuba City, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGI, Shuya c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED, 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
FUKUZAWA, Takashi c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED, 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19829747.5 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019JP25331 | Priority number, date | JP20180129123 | 06.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018129123 | [2021/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020008972 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819630 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/05, G01N37/00, C12M1/00, B01L3/00, B01L7/00, // G01N21/03 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G01N21/645 (EP);
C12M1/00 (EP,IL);
G01N21/6486 (US);
B01L7/525 (EP);
C12Q1/686 (US);
G01N21/05 (IL);
G01N21/64 (IL);
G01N37/00 (EP,IL);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2200/147 (EP);
B01L2300/0654 (EP);
B01L2300/0883 (EP);
B01L2300/168 (EP);
B01L2300/1822 (EP);
B01L2300/1827 (EP);
G01N2021/174 (US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP);
G01N2021/6421 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | G01N21/64, G01N21/05, G01N37/00, C12M1/00, B01L3/00, // G01N21/03 | ||
Former IPC [2021/19] | G01N21/64, G01N21/05, G01N37/00, C12M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | REAKTIONSBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | REACTION TREATMENT DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉACTION | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2020 | Translation filed | 14.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008053829 (HAYASHIDA CHIE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008297792 (KIM SUHYEON [KR], et al); | [Y]US2015024401 (SANO MINORU [JP], et al); | [Y]KR20150127762 (NANOBIOSYS INC [KR]); | [Y]WO2017115863 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2017119382 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2005091242 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [Y]JP2007071608 (SHARP KK, et al); | [Y]JP2007285999 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2008157814 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2011027748 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE, et al); | [Y]JP2013524169 ; | [Y]JP2015514218 ; | [A]JP2016095315 (IT-IS INT LTD); | [Y]WO2016157270 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2017145230 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2009232700 |