EP3819556 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku 108-8215 Tokyo / JP | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSURAYAMA, Yohei C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 02 /
AKATSUKA, Kei C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD., 16-5, Konan 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
KUROIWA, Toru C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD., 16-5, Konan 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19830394.3 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019JP24744 | Priority number, date | JP20180128686 | 06.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018128686 | [2021/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020008916 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819556 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B1/10, F25B13/00, F25B49/02 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
F25B47/006 (EP);
F25B49/022 (EP,KR);
F25B1/10 (EP,KR);
F25B13/00 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/0314 (EP);
F25B2313/0315 (EP);
F25B2400/13 (EP);
F25B2600/022 (KR);
F25B2600/0253 (EP);
F25B2600/2509 (EP);
F25B2700/1933 (EP);
F25B2700/21174 (KR);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | KÜHLKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2021/19] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CYCLE FRIGORIFIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2021 | Translation filed | 02.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000283568 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0023] - [0043]; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]JP4069733B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-6,8; | [A] - TELLO-OQUENDO FERNANDO M ET AL, "A comprehensive study of two-stage vapor compression cycles with vapor-injection for heating applications, taking into account heat sink of finite capacity", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRIGERATION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180602), vol. 93, doi:10.1016/J.IJREFRIG.2018.05.039, ISSN 0140-7007, pages 52 - 64, XP085495765 [A] 1-8 * pages 52-56; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijrefrig.2018.05.039 | International search | [YA]JPH07294029 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-5, 7-10 * , *[A] 6, 11; | [YA]JP2001272121 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-5, 7-10 * , * [A] 6, 11 | by applicant | JP2009222357 |