EP3818371 - BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR WITH INCREASED DYNAMIC RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zomedica Biotechnologies LLC 100 Phoenix Drive, Suite 190 Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states QORVO US, INC. 7628 Thorndike Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBSTER, James, Russell 3806 Victoria Street Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | 02 /
HARMON, Ian, Robert 1507 Washington Street NE Minneapolis, MN 55413 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19830843.9 | 05.07.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US40667 | Priority number, date | US201862694511P | 06.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694511 P | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010293 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818371 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/036, G01N33/53 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
G01N29/036 (EP,US);
G01N27/327 (US);
G01N29/222 (EP);
G01N33/5306 (US);
G01N33/54373 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | VOLUMENWELLENSCHALLRESONATOR MIT VERGRÖSSERTEM DYNAMIKBEREICH | [2021/19] | English: | BULK ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATOR WITH INCREASED DYNAMIC RANGE | [2021/19] | French: | RÉSONATEUR À ONDES ACOUSTIQUES DE VOLUME À PLAGE DYNAMIQUE ACCRUE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005016276 (GUAN SHENHENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2015377834 (SALVATI MICHAEL [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2009277271 (SEPPA HEIKKI [FI], et al); | [A]US2009282902 (WARTHOE PETER [DK]); | [A]US2010107285 (EKINCI KAMIL L [US], et al); | [A]US2014113840 (MARGALIT MORDEHAI [IL], et al); | [A]US2015377834 (SALVATI MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2017120242 (RIVAS RIO [US]); | [A]US2017261503 (MURDOCK BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]WO2018022778 (QORVO US INC [US]) | by applicant | US5932953 | US2005016276 | US8409875 | US2015377834 | US2019187098 |