EP3819346 - COATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIWA, Takashi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Masamitsu c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
ISHII, Azusa c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
OKA, Soichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19831099.7 | 27.05.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019JP20904 | Priority number, date | JP20180125871 | 02.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125871 | [2021/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020008753 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819346 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, C09D5/08, C09D7/61 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
C09D5/106 (EP);
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (US);
C08K3/30 (US);
C09D201/00 (US);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C08K2003/0893 (EP,US);
C08K2003/3045 (EP);
C08K2003/3063 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL | [2021/19] | English: | COATING MATERIAL | [2021/19] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | Translation filed | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2637773 (OKEN AARON); | [XYI]WO0055260 (INT COATINGS LTD [GB], et al); | [X]CN104530910 (QINGDAO JIASHANG CREATIVE CULTURE CO LTD); | [Y]EP2881443 (KYOTO MATERIALS CO LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [XYA]JPS49134740 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS LTD.) [X] 1-2, 5, 7-9 * , claims, examples, page 4, upper left column & AU 6201573 A & BE 806944 A & DE 2355395 A1 & FI 59807 B & FR 2205558 A1 & GB 1390270 A, claims, examples, page 2, lines 110-117 & IT 997783 B & NL 7314819 A & SE 391190 B * [Y] 3 [A] 4, 6; | [Y]WO2014020665 (KYOTO MATERIALS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 3* , paragraph [0052] & CN 104540910 A & EP 2881443 A1 & ES 2702794 T3 & KR 10-2015-0040306 A & US 2015/0247052 A1, paragraph [0068] * | by applicant | - JAPAN MINING INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, LEAD ZINC DEVELOPMENT CENTER, Zinc Handbook, (19930000), page 360 | - JAPAN PAINT MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, TECHNICAL COMMITTEEHEAVY-DUTY ANTICORROSION PAINT GROUP, Heavy-Duty Anticorrosion Paint Guidebook, (20130000), page 28 | - TAKASHI MIWAYUKITOSHI TAKESHITAAZUSA ISHI, "Technical report - Comparison of corrosion behaviors by various accelerated corrosion tests or field exposure tests using coated steel plates", Rust Prevention & Control Japan, (20170000), vol. 61, no. 12, pages 449 - 455 | - N. S. AZMAT et al., "Corrosion of Zn under acidified marine droplets", Corrosion Science, (20110000), vol. 53, doi:10.1016/j.corsci.2011.01.044, pages 1604 - 1615, XP028153358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.corsci.2011.01.044 | - RESEARCH GROUP OF GALVANIZED STEEL STRUCTURES, "Corrosion resistance of hot-dip galvanization", Corrosion resistance in water, (20180627), URL: https://jlzda.gr.jp/mekki/pdf/youyuu.pdf | - TAKASHI MIWAAZUSA ISHIHIROSHI KOIZUMI, "Study on accelerated corrosion test solutions more accurately reproducing atmospheric corrosion of zinc in salt-laden environments", Proceedings of JSCE materials and environments, (20180000), vol. B-308, pages 193 - 196 |