EP3796173 - DATA WRITING METHOD AND STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 03.10.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENG, Wendi Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19831322.3 | 04.03.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019CN76846 | Priority number, date | CN201810735737 | 05.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810735737 | [2021/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020007058 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796173 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G06F11/1448 (EP,CN);
G06F11/1469 (US);
G06F11/14 (EP);
G06F11/1451 (US);
G06F11/1458 (CN);
G06F11/1471 (EP);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0653 (US);
G06F3/0659 (US);
G06F2201/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | DATENSCHREIBVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2021/12] | English: | DATA WRITING METHOD AND STORAGE SYSTEM | [2021/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCRITURE DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2020 | Translation filed | 17.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 14.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015035814 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]WO2015081521 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]US2009210458 (GLOVER FRED S [US], et al)[A] 1-10; | [A]CN101526925 (HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [Y]CN103488431 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10; | [Y]CN103842954 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 |